EP2394310 - MECHANO-SENSITIVE ACTUATOR ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auckland UniServices Limited Level 10, 70 Symonds Street Auckland 1010 / NZ | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Iain, Alexander 3 Arama Avenue Titirangi 0604 Auckland / NZ | 02 /
CALIUS, Emilio, Patricio 1/10 Tagalad Road Mission Bay 1071 Auckland / NZ | 03 /
GISBY, Todd, Alan Unit 2, 10 Blomfield Spa Takapuna North Shore City 0622 Auckland / NZ | 04 /
O'BRIEN, Benjamin, Marc Unit 14 258 Hurstmere Road Takapuna North Shore City 0622 Auckland / NZ | 05 /
XIE, Shane 19 Ensign Place Hillcrest 0627 North Shore City / NZ | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/50] | Jones, Nicolas Guy, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10741457.5 | 01.02.2010 | WO2010NZ00008 | Priority number, date | NZ20090574809 | 09.02.2009 Original published format: NZ 57480909 | NZ20090577028 | 15.05.2009 Original published format: NZ 57702809 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010093261 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394310 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02N2/00, H01L41/08 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
H02N2/10 (EP,US);
F04B43/043 (EP,US);
F04B43/084 (EP,US);
F04B43/12 (EP,US);
F04B43/14 (EP,US);
H02N2/021 (EP,US);
H10N30/2048 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | H01L41/08, B81B7/04, H02N2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | MECHANISCH-SENSITIVE BETÄTIGERANORDNUNG | [2011/50] | English: | MECHANO-SENSITIVE ACTUATOR ARRAY | [2011/50] | French: | RÉSEAU D'ACTIONNEURS MÉCANO-SENSIBLES | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 27.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03081762 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US], et al); | International search | [X]US2002039620 (SHAHINPOOR MOHSEN [US], et al); | [A]US6781284 (PELRINE RONALD E [US], et al); | [A]WO2006065884 (BANISTER MARK [US]); | [A]WO2007090621 (MICROMUSCLE AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO2007091197 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); |