EP2396122 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISPENSING SEALANT WITHIN A GAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMAHON, Michael J. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | 02 /
PIOTROWSKI, Stanley 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | 03 /
DAVIS, George Matthew 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | 04 /
CARINGELLA, Anthony 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | 05 /
KESTNER, Kyle 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | 06 /
Van ERDEN, Donald L. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2011/51] | Application number, filing date | 10741543.2 | 14.01.2010 | WO2010US21013 | Priority number, date | US20090151842P | 12.02.2009 Original published format: US 151842 P | US20090582554 | 20.10.2009 Original published format: US 582554 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010093490 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396122 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/005 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
B05C17/00516 (EP,US);
B05C17/00503 (EP,US);
B05C17/00586 (EP,US);
E04F21/165 (EP,US);
E04F21/1652 (EP,US);
E04F21/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE EINES DICHTUNGSMITTELS IN EINE FUGE | [2011/51] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISPENSING SEALANT WITHIN A GAP | [2011/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DANS UN ESPACE | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 22.01.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007133096 (WALLS MURRAY FRANCIS [NZ]); | [Y]US2003222160 (GORDON FERGAL ANTHONY [IE]); | [Y]WO2005113907 (TEF INC [US], et al) |