EP2396754 - SECURE PAYMENT AND BILLING METHOD USING MOBILE PHONE NUMBER OR ACCOUNT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Net2Text Limited 377 East 33rd Street Suite 20B New York, NY 10016 / US | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMMAL, Karim, Anwar 377 East 33rd Street Suite 20B New York, NY 10016 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2018/45] |
Former [2013/03] | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10741708.1 | 11.02.2010 | [2018/45] | WO2010US23863 | Priority number, date | US20090152696P | 14.02.2009 Original published format: US 152696 P | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010093770 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2396754 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2396754 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/16, G06Q20/20, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/40, G06Q20/42 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
G06Q20/12 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/386 (EP,CN,EA,US);
G06Q20/00 (EP,EA,US);
G06Q20/16 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/32 (US);
G06Q20/322 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/325 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/3255 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/326 (EP,CN,EA,US);
G06Q20/382 (US);
G06Q20/3821 (US);
G06Q20/38215 (US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/425 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q30/06 (EA);
H04L12/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/1467 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04L63/0892 (US);
H04L63/126 (US);
H04W4/12 (EA);
H04W4/24 (EA);
H04W8/18 (EA);
| C-Set: |
G06Q20/40, G06Q20/40, G06Q20/20, G06Q20/322, G06Q20/325, G06Q20/3255, G06Q20/30, G06Q20/00, G06Q20/4012 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | G06Q20/16, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/40, G06Q20/42, H04W4/24 | ||
Former IPC [2011/51] | G06Q20/00, H04W4/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERES ZAHLUNGS- UND RECHNUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DER MOBILFUNKNUMMER ODER EINES KONTOS | [2011/51] | English: | SECURE PAYMENT AND BILLING METHOD USING MOBILE PHONE NUMBER OR ACCOUNT | [2011/51] | French: | PAIEMENT SÉCURISÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FACTURATION UTILISANT UN NUMÉRO OU UN COMPTE DE TÉLÉPHONE MOBILE | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 20.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18197485.8 / EP3447702 | EP20155124.9 / EP3667588 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0163375 (ADAMTECH LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 15, line 27 - page 22, line 15 * * page 26, line 14 - page 27, line 2 * * figures 1-3, 10, 11 *; | [X]WO03049364 (CONCEPTM COMPANY LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 22, line 25 - page 25, line 16 * * page 27, line 5 - page 33, line 11 * * figures 1-6, 9-14 *; | [X]US2004019564 (GOLDTHWAITE SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 37 - page 6, paragraph 42 * * page 7, paragraph 51 - page 8, paragraph 52 * * figures 2-2C, 13 *; | [A]WO2005086593 (LITTLE WORLD PRIVATE LTD A [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 26 - page 10, line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2006131390 (KIM MIKE I [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 5, paragraph 40 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2008126145 (RACKLEY III BRADY LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 9, paragraph 142 - page 15, paragraph 207 * * page 29, paragraph 360 - page 31, paragraph 374 * * page 39, paragraph 450 - page 40, paragraph 459 ** figures 1, 2, 17-18B, 32, 33 * | International search | [A]JP2006338414 (TRUST SYSTEM KK); | [A]KR20080005800 (BIT ILILSA CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20080096721 (BAE JAE KWANG [KR]); | [Y]US2008288351 (LEUNG GARY [HK], et al) |