EP2396429 - COMBINATIONS OF POLYMORPHISMS FOR DETERMINING ALLELE-SPECIFIC EXPRESSION OF IGF2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orion Genomics, LLC 4041 Forest Park Blvd. St. Louis, MO 63108 / US | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORDWAY, Jared 4266 Castleman Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63110 / US | 02 /
MALONEY, Rebecca 13581 Lavender Mist Lane Centreville Virginia 20120 / US | 03 /
LAKEY, Nathan 2040 Wilson Ridge Lane Chesterfield Missouri 63005 / US | 04 /
BUDIMAN, Muhammad A. 144 Spruce Tree Lane Manchester, Missouri 63021 / US | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/51] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10741738.8 | 11.02.2010 | WO2010US23939 | Priority number, date | US20090207450P | 11.02.2009 Original published format: US 207450 P | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010093820 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2396429 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2396429 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | 05.08.2011 | BA | 05.08.2011 | RS | 05.08.2011 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN AUS POLYMORPHISMEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON ALLELSPEZIFISCHER IGF2-EXPRESSION | [2011/51] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF POLYMORPHISMS FOR DETERMINING ALLELE-SPECIFIC EXPRESSION OF IGF2 | [2011/51] | French: | COMBINAISONS DE POLYMORPHISMES DESTINÉES À DÉTERMINER L'EXPRESSION SPÉCIFIQUE DES ALLÈLES D'IGF2 | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 23.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15163893.9 / EP2955234 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2010 | AT | 27.05.2015 | BE | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MK | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | PL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | SM | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | IE | 11.02.2016 | LU | 11.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 27.05.2015 | ||
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 27.05.2015 | |
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 27.05.2015 | |
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0004187 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 31; example 1 * * the whole document *; | [XPY]WO2009021054 (ORION GENOMICS LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-12,14,15 * page 45, paragraph 0147; tables 6-8 * [Y] 13; | [Y] - WOODSON KAREN ET AL, "Loss of insulin-like growth factor-II imprinting and the presence of screen-detected colorectal adenomas in women", NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE. JOURNAL (ONLINE), OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (20040303), vol. 96, no. 5, doi:10.1093/JNCI/DJH042, ISSN 1460-2105, pages 407 - 410, XP002504114 [Y] 1-15 * page 408, column 1, paragraph 2 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/JNCI/DJH042 | [Y] - CUI H ET AL, "Loss of imprinting in normal tissue of colorectal cancer patients with microsatellite instability", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19981101), vol. 4, no. 11, doi:10.1038/3260, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1276 - 1280, XP002233806 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/3260 | [A] - H. T. BJORNSSON ET AL, "Epigenetic Specificity of Loss of Imprinting of the IGF2 Gene in Wilms Tumors", JNCI JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, (20070815), vol. 99, no. 16, doi:10.1093/jnci/djm069, ISSN 0027-8874, pages 1270 - 1273, XP055038442 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jnci/djm069 | [A] - YUN K ET AL, "Analysis of IGF2 gene imprinting in breast and colorectal cancer by allele specific-PCR", JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, (19990101), vol. 187, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1096-9896(199904)187:5<518::AID-PATH276>3.0.CO;2-3, ISSN 0022-3417, pages 518 - 522, XP002953234 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9896(199904)187:5<518::AID-PATH276>3.0.CO;2-3 | [A] - BARRATT ET AL, "Identification of the sources of error in allele frequency estimations from pooled DNA indicates an optimal experimental design.", ANNALS OF HUMAN GENETICS, (20021101), vol. 66, no. 5-6, doi:10.1017/S0003480002001252, ISSN 0003-4800, pages 393 - 405, XP055038536 [A] 1-15 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1469-1809.2002.00125.x | International search | [A]US2001007749 (FEINBERG ANDREW P [US]); | [A]US2006292626 (KENNEDY GIULIA [US]); | [A]US2008220983 (TRINKLEIN NATHAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US3817837 | US3850752 | US3939350 | US3996345 | US4275149 | US4277437 | US4366241 | US5210015 | US5310893 | WO9511995 | US5451512 | US5468613 | US5487972 | US5491063 | US5571673 | US5604099 | US5804375 | US6117635 | US6326145 | WO2004003003 | - DECHIARA TM ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 64, pages 849 - 859 | - RAINIER S ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 747 - 749 | - OGAWA ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 749 - 751 | - FALLS ET AL., AJP, (1999), vol. 154, pages 635 - 647 | - KINOCHI ET AL., CANCER LETTERS, (1996), vol. 107, pages 105 - 108 | - NISHIHARA S., INT. JOUR. ONCOL., (2000), vol. 17, pages 317 - 322 | - CUI H, NATURE MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 4-11, pages 1276 - 1280 | - NAKAGAWA H, PNAS, (2001), vol. 98-2, pages 591 - 596 | - OGAWA ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1993), vol. 5, pages 408 - 412 | - CUI H, SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, page 1753 | - CUI H ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 4-11, pages 1276 - 1280 | - WOODSON K ET AL., JNCI, (2004), vol. 96, pages 407 - 410 | - CRUZ-CORREA M ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2004), vol. 126, pages 964 - 970 | - CONNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 278 - 282 | - HOLLAND ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 88, pages 7276 - 7280 | - WHITCOMBE ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 17, pages 804 - 807 | - NAZARENKO ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 2516 - 2521 | - KANEDA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2007), vol. 104, no. 52, pages 20926 - 20931 |