EP2449115 - METHODS AND KITS FOR HIGH EFFICIENCY ENGINEERING OF CONDITIONAL MOUSE ALLELES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Basel Office of Technology Transfer Schützenmattstrasse 16 4003 Basel / CH | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ-RIOS, Javier Metzerstrasse 35 CH-4056 Basel / CH | 02 /
ZELLER. Rolf Buchenstrasse 30 CH-4054 Basel / CH | 03 /
OSTERWALDER, Marco Holeestrasse 116 4054 Basel / CH | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/33] | Texier, Christian Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2012/19] | Schulz Junghans Chausseestrasse 5 10115 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10742251.1 | 28.06.2010 | WO2010IB01560 | Priority number, date | US20090221144P | 29.06.2009 Original published format: US 221144 P | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011001247 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2449115 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/90 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
C12N15/63 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,US);
C12N2800/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KITS FÜR DIE LEISTUNGSSTARKE MANIPULATION VON BEDINGTEN MAUS-ALLELEN | [2012/19] | English: | METHODS AND KITS FOR HIGH EFFICIENCY ENGINEERING OF CONDITIONAL MOUSE ALLELES | [2012/19] | French: | PROCEDES ET TROUSSES POUR APPLICATIONS TECHNIQUES A HAUTE EFFICACITE D'ALLELES DE SOURIS CONDITIONNELS | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI] - BRANDA C S ET AL, "Talking about a revolution: The impact of site-specific recombinases on genetic analyses in mice", DEVELOPMENTAL CELL, CELL PRESS, US, (20040101), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 1534-5807, pages 7 - 28, XP002579368 [X] 16-18,20 *Whole document, in particular: figure 3* [A] 1-15 [I] 19,21 | [XAI] - LAUTH MATTHIAS ET AL, "Stable and efficient cassette exchange under non-selectable conditions by combined use of two site-specific recombinases.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20021101), vol. 30, no. 21, ISSN 1362-4962, pages 1 - 7, XP002611951 [X] 16-18,20 *Whole document, in particular: Abstract and Introduction* [A] 1-15 [I] 19,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gnf114 | [XAI] - FENG Y-Q ET AL, "Site-specific chromosomal integration in mammalian cells: highly efficient CRE recombinase-mediated cassette exchange", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (19991001), vol. 292, no. 4, doi:10.1006/JMBI.1999.3113, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 779 - 785, XP004462572 [X] 16-18,20 *Whole document, in particular: Abstract* [A] 1-15 [I] 19,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.3113 | [T] - OSTERWALDER MARCO ET AL, "Dual RMCE for efficient re-engineering of mouse mutant alleles", NATURE METHODS, (201011), vol. 7, no. 11, ISSN 1548-7091, pages 893 - 896, XP002611952 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1521 | by applicant | - SOUKHAREV ET AL., NUGEIC ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, page E21 | - SEIBLER, J. ET AL., J. BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, pages 6229 - 34 | - LAUTH ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2002), vol. 30, page E115 | - CAPECCHI, M.R., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1288 - 92 | - GU ET AL., SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 103 - 6 | - BRANDA, C.S.; DYMECKI, S.M., DEV. CELL, (2004), vol. 6, pages 7 - 28 | - WIRTH, D. ET AL., CUM OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 18, pages 411 - 9 | - COLLINS ET AL., CELL, (2007), vol. 129, page 235 | - SCHNUTGEN ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2003), vol. 21, pages 562 - 5 | - GALLI A. ET AL., PLOS GENET, (2010), vol. 6, no. 4, page E1000901 | - SRIVASTAVA ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1997), vol. 16, pages 154 - 60 | - BELTEKI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 21, pages 321 - 4 | - SHIMSHEK ET AL., GENESIS, (2002), vol. 32, pages 19 - 26 | - RAYMOND, C.S.; SORIANO, P., PLOS ONE, (2007), vol. 2, page E162 | - ZHENG ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (2000), vol. 20, pages 648 - 55 | - MEYERS ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1998), vol. 18, pages 136 - 41 |