EP2462304 - DRILLING RIG WITH HINGED, RETRACTABLE OUTRIGGERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Oilwell Varco, L.P. 7909 Parkwood Circle Drive Houston, Texas 77036 / US | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOROKAN, Ron 2-23114 Twp Road 514 Sherwood Park Alberta T8B-1K9 / CA | 02 /
KONDUC, Kameron, Wayne 8104-84 Ave. Edmonton Alberta T6C-1C7 / CA | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Phillip Brian Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Lucas, Phillip Brian Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10742979.7 | 06.08.2010 | WO2010US44646 | Priority number, date | US20090232075P | 07.08.2009 Original published format: US 232075 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011017584 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2462304 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/02 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
E21B7/02 (EP,US);
E21B15/003 (US);
E21B19/155 (US);
E21B15/00 (US);
E21B7/023 (US);
Y10T29/49716 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | BOHRGESTELL MIT GELENKIGEN EINZIEHBAREN AUSLEGERN | [2012/24] | English: | DRILLING RIG WITH HINGED, RETRACTABLE OUTRIGGERS | [2012/24] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORAGE AVEC STABILISATEURS ARTICULÉS RÉTRACTABLES | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 09.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 21.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4899832 (BIERSCHEID JR ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1-7,15-30 * figures 1, 12, 13 *; | [A]US2002003119 (RODE RALF [DE], et al) [A] 1-7,15-30 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US6546312 (MATSUMOTO KESAFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-7,15-30* figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2007215359 (WOOD THOMAS D [CA], et al) [A] 1-7,15-30 * figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | US3754361 | US3807109 | US4290495 | US4305237 | US4375892 | US4823953 | US4823870 | US2007215359 |