EP2398384 - BREASTFEEDING MILK CONSUMPTION MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovia Medical Ltd 1 Ben Tzvi St. 53630 Givatayim / IL | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARARI, Tzach 1 Ben Tzvi St. 53630 Givatayim / IL | 02 /
HULLER-HARARI, Liat 1 Ben Tvi Blvd 53630 Givatayim / IL | 03 /
KIVITY, Shaye 1 Shederot Avraham 52423 Ramat Gan / IL | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10743467.2 | 17.02.2010 | WO2010IL00142 | Priority number, date | US20090152977P | 17.02.2009 Original published format: US 152977 P | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010095133 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2398384 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/107, A61M1/06 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
A61B5/1075 (EP,US);
A61B5/1073 (EP,US);
A61B5/4312 (EP,US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,US);
A61M1/067 (EP);
A61B5/6823 (EP,US);
A61M1/06 (EP,US);
A61M1/062 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | A61B5/107 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DES MILCHKONSUMS BEIM STILLEN | [2011/52] | English: | BREASTFEEDING MILK CONSUMPTION MEASURING DEVICE | [2011/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE CONSOMMATION DE LAIT EN ALLAITEMENT MATERNEL | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 26.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 20.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2014 | 28.02.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4024856 (KIRIANOFF TIMOFEY GREGORY) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4338953 (WARD CHRISTOPHER M) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2435618 (PLAYTEX PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]ES2311413 (SABIRMEDICAL S L [ES]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - Peter G. Arthur ET AL, "MEASURING SHORT-TERM RATES OF MILK SYNTHESIS IN BREAST-FEEDING MOTHERS", Experimental Physiology, ENGLAND, (19890101), pages 419 - 428, URL: http://ep.physoc.org/content/74/4/419.abstract, (20140905), XP055138518 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1113/expphysiol.1989.sp003289 | [A] - Hytten, F.E., "Clinical and chemical studies in human Lactation VI. The functional capacity of the breast", British Medical Journal, vol. 1, no. 4867, (19540130), pages 912 - 915, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC2093641/pdf/brmedj03386-0030.pdf, (20140908), XP055138599 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SE DALY ET AL, "The determination of short-term breast volume changes and the rate of synthesis of human milk using computerized breast measurement", EXPERIMENTAL PHYSIOLOGY, GB, (19920101), vol. 77, no. 1, ISSN 0958-0670, pages 79 - 87, XP055100247 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1113/expphysiol.1992.sp003584 | [A] - Jacqueline C Kent ET AL, "Experimental Physiology (1999), 84, 435-447 Printed in Great Britain BREAST VOLUME AND MILK PRODUCTION DURING EXTENDED LACTATION IN WOMEN", (19990101), URL: http://ep.physoc.org/content/84/2/435.full.pdf, (20140905), XP055138474 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - DALY S E J ET AL, "Degree of breast emptying explains change in the fat content, but not fatty acid composition, of human milk", EXPERIMENTAL PHYSIOLOGY, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19930101), vol. 78, no. 6, ISSN 0958-0670, pages 741 - 755, XP008030117 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4024856 (KIRIANOFF TIMOFEY GREGORY); | [Y]US4338953 (WARD CHRISTOPHER M); | [Y]US4924862 (LEVINSON GARY [US]); | [A]US2008097169 (LONG ANDREW M [US], et al); | [X] - DALY, S.J. ET AL., "The determination of short-term breast volume changes and the rate of synthesis of human milk using computerized breast measurement", EXPERIMENTAL PHYSIOLOGY, vol. 77, no. 1, (19920101), pages 79 - 87, URL: http://ep.physoc.org/content/77/1/79.full.pdf, (20100622), XP055100247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1113/expphysiol.1992.sp003584 |