EP2400670 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAI, Takayuki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/43] |
Former [2011/52] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10743483.9 | 20.01.2010 | [2017/43] | WO2010JP00298 | Priority number, date | JP20090035988 | 19.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009035988 | [2011/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010095350 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2400670 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2400670 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/02, H04B7/04, H04B7/08, H04B7/12, H04J99/00, H04L1/04, H04B7/06, H04L1/00, H04L1/06 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H04B7/0689 (EP,US);
H04B7/0857 (EP,US);
H04B7/0871 (EP,US);
H04B7/12 (EP,US);
H04L1/0036 (EP,US);
H04L1/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | H04B7/02, H04B7/04, H04B7/08, H04B7/12, H04J99/00, H04L1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2011/52] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2011/52] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2011 | Translation filed | 07.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 28.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2010 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | IE | 20.01.2018 | LU | 20.01.2018 | MT | 20.01.2018 | BG | 25.01.2018 | GB | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 20.01.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
MT | 20.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
MT | 20.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
MT | 20.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 20.01.2018 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 25.10.2017 | |
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9749199 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,5,8 * abstract * * page 7, lines 13-25 * * page 10, line 17 - page 11, line 19 * * page 12, lines 23-25 * * page 13, line 23 - page 20, line 23 * * figures 1-7 * [A] 2-4,6,7,9-11; | [XA]FR2835369 (EVOLIUM SAS [FR]) [X] 1,5,8 * abstract * * page 2, line 18 - page 5, line 33 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 33 * [A] 2-4,6,7,9-11; | [A]GB2385750 (RAYTHEON CO [US]) [A] 2-4,6,7,9-11 * abstract * * page 3, lines 6-27 *; | [A]EP1150440 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 2-4,6,7,9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0010] , [0012] , [0020] *; | [A]EP1608083 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [A] 2-4,6,7,9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0010] - [0014] - [0027] , [0028] , [0031] , [0033] - [0037] - [0040] * | International search | [X]JPS5597746 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPH09191234 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2002077094 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2000269830 (NEC WIRELESS NETWORKS LTD) | by applicant | JP2005277910 | JPH09307490 |