EP2399906 - AROMATIC AMINE DERIVATIVE AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YABUNOUCHI, Nobuhiro 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Tomoki 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10743747.7 | 16.02.2010 | WO2010JP52292 | Priority number, date | JP20090035387 | 18.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009035387 | [2011/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010095621 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399906 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/86, C07D405/04, C07D405/10, C07D405/14, C07D409/04, C07D409/10, C07D409/14, C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
C07D209/86 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/631 (KR);
C07D405/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/16 (KR);
H10K85/324 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/633 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/636 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Title | German: | AROMATISCHES AMINDERIVAT UND ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZIERENDES ELEMENT | [2011/52] | English: | AROMATIC AMINE DERIVATIVE AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT | [2011/52] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'AMINE AROMATIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2011 | Translation filed | 26.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 09.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2005112765 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [XDI]WO2008072596 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2009008099 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH11167990 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [X]JP2004171808 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC); | [X]JP2006056841 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [X]WO2006025290 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [X]JP2008078362 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2008294161 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]WO2009008100 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | [XP]WO2009061156 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al); | [XE]WO2010021524 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al); | by applicant | US4720432 | US5061569 | JPH11167990 | JP2003133075 | JP2003171366 | JP2003267972 | WO2006073054 | WO2006114921 | WO2007125714 | WO2008062636 | JP2008127290 | WO2008072596 |