EP2399200 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF PROCESSING COOKIES ACROSS DOMAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 Grand Cayman / KY | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Limin C/o Alibaba.com Corporation 6/F Chuangye Mansion East Software Park Huaxing Road No.99 Hangzhou 310099 / CN | 02 /
LUO, Qibu C/o Alibaba.com Corporation 6/F Chuangye Mansion East Software Park Huaxing Road No. 99 Hangzhou 310099 / CN | 03 /
LI, Mu C/o Alibaba.com Corporation 6/F Chuangye Mansion East Software Park Huaxing Road No. 99 Hangzhou 310099 / CN | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10744090.1 | 07.01.2010 | WO2010US20360 | Priority number, date | CN2009107729 | 17.02.2009 Original published format: CN200910007729 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010096211 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399200 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
G06F16/9574 (EP,US);
G06F15/173 (US)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | G06F15/173 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DOMÄNENÜBERGREIFENDEN VERARBEITUNG VON COOKIES | [2011/52] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF PROCESSING COOKIES ACROSS DOMAINS | [2011/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE TÉMOINS DE CONNEXION SUR DES DOMAINES | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 05.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Anonymous, "Local shared object - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20090214), pages 1 - 4, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Local_shared_object&oldid=270690326, (20160224), XP055252743 [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 2 * | International search | [Y]US2009024748 (GOLDSPINK LINCOLN MARK VAUGHAN [GB], et al); | [Y]US2006282660 (VARGHESE THOMAS E [US], et al); | [A]US7188181 (SQUIER ANTHONY C [US], et al); | [A]US2008072301 (CHIA PEI Y [SG], et al); | [A]US2005216582 (TOOMEY CHRISTOPHER N [US], et al); | [A]US2003037131 (VERMA DINESH C [US]) |