EP2398614 - CUTTING TOOL COMPONENTS WITH WEAR-RESISTANT CLADDING LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [2015/28] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Kennametal Inc. 1600 Technology Way P.O. Box 231 Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLWERK, Charles Hunter 1003 Wildwood Lane New Albany Indiana 47150 / US | 02 /
TENNANT, Otis Karl 160 Lindenmeyer Underwood Indiana 47177 / US | 03 /
GRAY, Christian Bannehr 12 Sassafras Lane Greensburg Pennsylvania 15601 / US | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2011/52] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10744157.8 | 11.02.2010 | WO2010US23879 | Priority number, date | US20090388551 | 19.02.2009 Original published format: US 388551 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010096327 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2398614 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2398614 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14, B23B27/16, B23B29/04 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
B23B27/1666 (EP,US);
C23C14/14 (KR);
B23B27/14 (KR);
B23B27/16 (KR);
B23B29/04 (EP,US);
B23C5/20 (KR);
B23B2205/16 (EP,US);
B23B2222/28 (EP,US);
B23B2224/04 (EP,US);
B23B2228/10 (EP,US);
B23B2240/08 (EP,US);
B23B2260/03 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | B23B27/14, B23B27/16, B23C5/16, B23C5/20, C23C14/14, C23C14/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDINSTRUMENTTEILE MIT VERSCHLEISSBESTÄNDIGER UMMANTELUNG | [2011/52] | English: | CUTTING TOOL COMPONENTS WITH WEAR-RESISTANT CLADDING LAYER | [2011/52] | French: | COMPOSANTS POUR OUTIL DE COUPE AVEC COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT RÉSISTANT À L'USURE | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 23.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2010 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BE | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | HR | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | MK | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | PL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | SM | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | NO | 08.10.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | GB | 11.02.2016 | IE | 11.02.2016 | LU | 11.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 11.02.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 11.02.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.02.2010 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 11.02.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 11.02.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 11.02.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
GB | 11.02.2016 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 11.02.2016 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 11.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 08.07.2015 | |
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6649682 (BRETON ERNEST J [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * claim 16 * * column 3, line 45 - line 54 * * column 21, line 6 - line 19 *; | [Y]US4414870 (PETERSON JR JOHN L [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,6 * figures 1-14 * * column 2, line 34 - line 43 * * column 5, line 27 - line 33 *; | [Y]US2002119017 (GATES ALFRED S [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0017] * * figures 1-4 * * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4008976 (HOLZL ROBERT A); | [A]JPS5655564 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP); | [A]US2007065331 (KAWASAKI MINORU [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005061165 (PECHINEY RHENALU [FR], et al) |