EP2398410 - PEDIATRIC LONG BONE SUPPORT OR FIXATION PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OrthoPediatrics Corp. 210 North Buffalo Street Warsaw, IN 46580 / US | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANIELS, David 1618 Hawthorne Court Winona Lake IN 46590 / US | 02 /
BAILEY, Dave 5802 Miami Street South Bend IN 46614 / US | 03 /
BREMER, Chris 294 North County Road 175 East Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | 04 /
HOERNSCHEMEYER, Daniel 4810 Silver Cliff Drive Columbia MO 65203 / US | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Dauncey, Mark Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2019/20] |
Former [2011/52] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10744450.7 | 23.02.2010 | [2019/20] | WO2010US24970 | Priority number, date | US20090390834 | 23.02.2009 Original published format: US 390834 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010096792 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2398410 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2398410 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/74, A61B17/76, A61B17/64, A61B17/58, A61B17/80 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/8061 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/1725 (KR);
A61B17/58 (KR);
A61B17/7029 (KR);
A61B17/7041 (KR);
A61B17/8057 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S623/911 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | A61B17/74, A61B17/76, A61B17/64, A61B17/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANGKNOCHENSTÜTZE ODER -FIXIERUNGSPLATTE FÜR KINDER | [2011/52] | English: | PEDIATRIC LONG BONE SUPPORT OR FIXATION PLATE | [2011/52] | French: | PLAQUE DE SUPPORT OU DE FIXATION POUR OS LONG PÉDIATRIQUE | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 23.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2010 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | ES | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | IT | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | NL | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2406429 (DAYAN ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]US2002156474 (WACK MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0045] - [0062] - [0075] - [0083]; figures 6-12 *; | [XI]US6623486 (WEAVER PAUL C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-18,20,21 * column 5, lines 1-7; figures 4,7,8,13-16,22 * * column 5, line 66 - column 7, line 17 * [I] 5,6,19; | [XI]US2006173458 (FORSTEIN MICAH [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-18,20,21 * paragraphs [0067] - [0081] - [0086]; figures 1-6,8,10,15 * [I] 5,6,19; | [XI]US2008300637 (AUSTIN GENE EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-18,20,21 * paragraphs [0106] , [0107] , [0131] , [0133] , [0162] , [0163]; figures 6,20,23-31,39,48 * [I] 5,6,19 | International search | [Y]US2004116930 (O'DRISCOLL SHAWN W [US], et al); | [A]US2004167522 (NIEDERBERGER ALFRED [CH], et al); | [A]US2005021033 (ZEILER CLAUDIUS [DE], et al); | [Y]US7137987 (PATTERSON CHAD J [US], et al); | [A]US2007270849 (ORBAY JORGE L [US], et al) | by applicant | US6623486 | US2008300637 |