EP2595937 - CONCRETE SUBSTITUTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green Concrete Products Limited Unit 2 Kings Close Charfleets Industrial Estate Canvey Island Chelmsford, Essex SS8 0QZ / GB | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Andrew James Elm Manor Main Road Elm Wisbech Cambridgeshire PE14 0AG / GB | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Sandersons D2 Knowledge Gateway Nesfield Road Colchester, Essex CO4 3ZL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Sanderson, James L.C. Sanderson & Co., 34 East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 10744613.0 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010GB51202 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012010813 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2595937 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C04B26/16, C04B38/02, C08G18/00 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
C04B26/16 (EP,US);
C04B38/02 (EP,US);
C08G18/6625 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00017 (EP,US);
Y02P30/00 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B26/16, C04B14/06, C04B14/28, C04B18/08, C04B18/22, C04B18/24, C04B18/305, C04B22/002, C04B38/02, C04B2103/0067, C04B2103/10, C04B2103/30, C04B2103/40, C04B2103/54, C04B2103/63 (EP,US);
C04B26/16, C04B14/06, C04B14/28, C04B18/08, C04B18/22, C04B18/24, C04B18/305, C04B24/045, C04B38/02, C04B2103/0067, C04B2103/10, C04B2103/30, C04B2103/40, C04B2103/54, C04B2103/63 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Title | German: | BETONERSATZ | [2013/22] | English: | CONCRETE SUBSTITUTE | [2013/22] | French: | SUBSTITUT AU BÉTON | [2013/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 26.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9930882 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-20 * example 1; claims 1-17 *; | [X]WO0246262 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-20 * example 2; claims 1-13 *; | [X]EP1541605 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-20 * example 1; claims 1-9 *; | [X]DE202008016807U (KOHLSTADT HANS PETER [DE]) [X] 1-20* examples 1-4 *; | [X]WO2010078895 (KOHLSTADT HANS-PETER [DE]) [X] 1-20 * examples 1-3; claims 1-16 * |