Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2440750 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2015 | B1 | EP2440750 | 18.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP03475 | 10.06.2010 | DE102009024480 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010142440 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2011 | A3 | WO2010142440 | 16.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102009024480 | 10.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009024480 | 14.07.2011 | B4 | DE102009024480 | 16.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009024480 | 10.06.2009 |