EP2470300 - SOLUTIONS AND CATALYSTS COMPRISING GROUP VI METAL, GROUP VIII METAL, PHOSPHOROUS AND AN ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albemarle Europe Sprl. Parc Scientifique de LLN Rue du Bosquet 9 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2022/40] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Albemarle Europe Sprl. Parc Scientifique de LLN Rue du Bosquet 9 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIJSBOUTS-SPICKOVA, Sona Goudenregenstraat 1 NL-5253 BE Nieuwkuijk / NL | 02 /
JANSEN, Marcel Adriaan Stepelerveld 65 NL-2151 JM Nieuw Vennep / NL | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Sommer, Andrea Andrea Sommer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Uhlandstraße 2 80336 München / DE | [2022/40] |
Former [2014/24] | Andrae Westendorp Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/27] | Westendorp, Michael Oliver Westendorp I Sommer Uhlandstrasse 2 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10744946.4 | 24.08.2010 | [2022/40] | WO2010EP62282 | Priority number, date | US20090236436 | 24.08.2009 Original published format: US 236436 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011023668 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2470300 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2470300 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/888, B01J23/88, B01J27/185, B01J27/19, B01J21/04, B01J37/02, B01J37/08 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
B01J27/19 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J27/1853 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J23/88 (EP,CN,US);
B01J21/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/888 (EP,CN,US);
B01J27/188 (KR);
B01J37/0203 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J37/0213 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J37/0236 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/08 (EP,US);
C10G45/00 (EP,US);
C10G45/04 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSUNGEN UND KATALYSATOREN MIT EINEM GRUPPE-VI-METALL, GRUPPE-VIII-METALL, PHOSPHOR UND EINEM ZUSATZ | [2012/27] | English: | SOLUTIONS AND CATALYSTS COMPRISING GROUP VI METAL, GROUP VIII METAL, PHOSPHOROUS AND AN ADDITIVE | [2012/27] | French: | SOLUTIONS ET CATALYSEURS COMPRENANT UN MÉTAL DU GROUPE VI, UN MÉTAL DU GROUPE VIII ET DU PHOSPHORE | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 25.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Request for further processing for: | 15.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NO | 05.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0601722 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [I] 1-24 * page 3, line 50 - line 58; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9641848 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-24 * page 10, line 26 - line 27; example - * * page 12, line 13 - line 15 *; | [X]CA2302969 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [X] 1-24 * page 7, line 18 - line 21; example - *; | [X]EP1041133 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [X] 16-33 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; example -; claim - ** paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0017] *; | [X]WO0102092 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-24 * page 5, line 25 - line 27; example -; claim - * * page 6, line 30 - line 33 * * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 6 *; | [X]US2002013223 (EIJSBOUTS SONJA [NL], et al) [X] 1-24 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0051]; example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2005035691 (ALBEMARLE NETHERLANDS BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-24 * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 3; example 1 *; | [X]US6923904 (PLANTENGA FRANS LODEWIJK [NL], et al) [X] 16-33 * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 58; example -; claim - *; | [E]WO2010121807 (ALBEMARLE EUROPE SPRL [BE], et al) [E] 1-24 * the whole document * | Examination | CN1172692 | by applicant | US4028227 | EP0601722 |