EP2446136 - BRUSH DEVICE FOR A ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR A STARTER FOR THE COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2, rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2015/21] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2 rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENTIL, Maximilien 64 rue Villeroy F-69003 Lyon / FR | 02 /
ODIN, Laurent Mianges Chemin des Chênes F-38460 Chamagnieu / FR | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/18] | Application number, filing date | 10745305.2 | 23.06.2010 | WO2010FR51282 | Priority number, date | FR20090054363 | 26.06.2009 Original published format: FR 0954363 | [2012/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010149932 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2446136 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2446136 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08, H02K23/18, H02K11/00, H02K13/10 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H02K5/148 (EP);
H01R39/44 (EP);
H02K13/10 (EP);
H02K23/18 (EP);
F02N11/0859 (EP);
F02N15/067 (EP);
H02K2213/03 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE BÜRSTEN EINER ROTIERENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE, INSBESONDERE FÜR DEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2014/35] | English: | BRUSH DEVICE FOR A ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR A STARTER FOR THE COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2012/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF A BALAI POUR UNE MACHINE ELECTRIQUE TOURNANTE, NOTAMMENT UN DEMARREUR POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2012/18] |
Former [2012/18] | BÜRSTENVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE ROTATIONSMASCHINE, IM BESONDEREN EINEN STARTER FÜR DEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 20.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2010 | AL | 20.05.2015 | AT | 20.05.2015 | CY | 20.05.2015 | CZ | 20.05.2015 | DK | 20.05.2015 | EE | 20.05.2015 | ES | 20.05.2015 | FI | 20.05.2015 | HR | 20.05.2015 | IT | 20.05.2015 | LT | 20.05.2015 | LV | 20.05.2015 | MC | 20.05.2015 | MK | 20.05.2015 | MT | 20.05.2015 | NL | 20.05.2015 | PL | 20.05.2015 | RO | 20.05.2015 | SE | 20.05.2015 | SI | 20.05.2015 | SK | 20.05.2015 | SM | 20.05.2015 | TR | 20.05.2015 | IE | 23.06.2015 | LU | 23.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | FR | 20.07.2015 | BG | 20.08.2015 | NO | 20.08.2015 | GR | 21.08.2015 | IS | 20.09.2015 | PT | 21.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MK | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
LU | 23.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.06.2010 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 20.07.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
IE | 23.06.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3737603 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-7,9-13* figures 1-8 *; | [Y]DE3741919 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [Y] 1,10-13 * figures 1-11 *; | [YA]DE10059680 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-13 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] - [0027] - [0029] , [0031] , [0032]; figures 1-6 * [A] 8 |