EP2452411 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE SEPARATE POWER SUPPLY OF ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/20] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE SEPARATE POWER SUPPLYING OF ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS | ||
[2012/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agostinelli, Paolo Santa Croce, 2257/A 30135 Venezia / IT | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10745398.7 | 09.07.2010 | WO2010IB53159 | Priority number, date | IT2009FI00154 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: IT FI20090154 | [2012/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011004350 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2452411 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2452411 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/08 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
H02J1/082 (EP,US);
H02J7/35 (KR);
H02J1/08 (KR,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SEPARATEN STROMVERSORGUNG VON ELEKTRONISCHEN SCHALTUNGEN | [2012/20] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE SEPARATE POWER SUPPLY OF ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS | [2012/52] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D OBTENIR UNE ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE DISTINCTE DE CIRCUITS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2012/20] |
Former [2012/20] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR THE SEPARATE POWER SUPPLYING OF ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 17.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2010 | AL | 26.06.2013 | BE | 26.06.2013 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | HR | 26.06.2013 | IT | 26.06.2013 | LT | 26.06.2013 | LV | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | MK | 26.06.2013 | MT | 26.06.2013 | PL | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SK | 26.06.2013 | SM | 26.06.2013 | TR | 26.06.2013 | IE | 09.07.2013 | LU | 09.07.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | NO | 26.09.2013 | GR | 27.09.2013 | ES | 07.10.2013 | IS | 26.10.2013 | PT | 28.10.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 09.07.2010 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 09.07.2013 | ||
LU | 09.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
MK | 26.06.2013 | ||
MT | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 09.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
SM | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 09.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
IE | 09.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
IT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/16] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
HR | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
NO | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 26.06.2013 | |
NO | 26.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5737940 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS6284576 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US5635915 (GRAY TREVOR T [AU]); | [Y]US2007070662 (LIU XIAN-FA [CN]) | by applicant | IT1323277 |