EP2449351 - PACKAGED PRODUCT WITH SCOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANGIN, Raphael, Louis 44 Amelgemweg 1780 Wemmel / BE | 02 /
ZHANG, Wei 6-1-202 room Yuexiuyuan Xisanqi Town Haidian District Beijing 100096 / CN | 03 /
REN, Wei 11-101 Liu Fang Nan Li Chaoyang District Beijing 100028 / CN | 04 /
DING, Guangyan 413-4750 Arbutus Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6J 4A4 / CA | 05 /
ABERGAS, Billy, Gonzales Unit 3843 Capital Paradise Baixin Zhuang Cun Nan Hou Shayu Beijing 101300 / CN | 06 /
SAINT-IGNAN, Katy 46 rue de l'ermitage B-1050 Ixelles / BE | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Howard, Phillip Jan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Howard, Phillip Jan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2013/04] | Pickford, James Lawrence Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2012/23] | Howard, Phillip Jan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2012/19] | Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10745464.7 | 23.06.2010 | WO2010US39565 | Priority number, date | US20090221589P | 30.06.2009 Original published format: US 221589 P | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011002639 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2449351 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01F19/00, A47G21/04, B65D77/24, B65D33/16 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
G01F19/002 (EP,US);
B65D33/1616 (EP,US);
B65D77/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | VERPACKTES PRODUKT MIT EINER SCHAUFEL | [2012/19] | English: | PACKAGED PRODUCT WITH SCOOP | [2012/19] | French: | PRODUIT CONDITIONNÉ ACCOMPAGNÉ D UNE PELLE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 06.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE8411045U (ZUECHNER BLECHWAREN [DE]) [X] 1,6-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US5137316 (FOOS DOUGLAS E [US]) [X] 1,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5347865 (MULRY PATRICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XI]US5918922 (LATHROP GREGORY ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * [I] 5,10; | [X]US2004099566 (KIPPERMAN STUART R [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0627891 | JPH10258841 |