EP2461811 - MACROCYCLIC SERINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS USEFUL AGAINST VIRAL INFECTIONS, PARTICULARLY HCV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idenix Pharmaceuticals LLC 320 Bent Street, Floor 4 Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | [2016/16] |
Former [2016/02] | For all designated states Idenix Pharmaceuticals LLC. 320 Bent Street, Floor 4 Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | ||
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states IDENIX Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 320 Bent Street, Floor 4 Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states IDENIX Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 60 Hampshire Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARSY, Christophe Claude 6 Rue des Cedres F-34830 Jacou / FR | 02 /
ALEXANDRE, Francois-Rene Residence Occitanie 200 Avenue du Major Flandre F-34090 Montpellier / FR | 03 /
LEROY, Frederic 5 Rue de la Clairette F-34570 Montarnaud / FR | 04 /
CONVARD, Thierry 7 Avenue de Bel Air F-69580 Sathonay-camp / FR | 05 /
SURLERAUX, Dominique Rue de la Scaillee 13 B-1440 Wauthier-Braine / BE | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [2016/16] |
Former [2013/52] | Savic, Bojan, et al Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | Ritter, Thomas Kurt Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10745691.5 | 04.08.2010 | [2016/16] | WO2010US44334 | Priority number, date | US20090231636P | 05.08.2009 Original published format: US 231636 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011017389 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2461811 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2461811 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4709, C07D417/04, A61P31/14 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/403 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAKROCYCLISCHE SERINPROTEASEHEMMER GEGEN VIRALE INFEKTIONEN, IM BESONDEREN HVC | [2012/24] | English: | MACROCYCLIC SERINE PROTEASE INHIBITORS USEFUL AGAINST VIRAL INFECTIONS, PARTICULARLY HCV | [2012/24] | French: | INHIBITEURS MACROCYCLIQUES DE LA SÉRINE PROTÉASE MACROCYCLIQUE UTILES CONTRE LES INFECTIONS VIRALES, EN PARTICULIER LE VIRUS DE L'HÉPATITE C | [2015/50] |
Former [2012/24] | INHIBITEURS MACROCYCLIQUES DE LA SÉRINE PROTÉASE MACROCYCLIQUE UTILES CONTRE LES INFECTIONS VIRALES, EN PARTICULIER LE VIRUS DE L HÉPATITE C | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 13.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2010 | AL | 20.04.2016 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | IE | 04.08.2016 | LU | 04.08.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.08.2016 | ||
LU | 04.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.08.2016 | ||
LU | 04.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.08.2016 | ||
LU | 04.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.08.2016 | ||
LU | 04.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.08.2016 | ||
LU | 04.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
IE | 04.08.2016 | ||
LU | 04.08.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007014926 (TIBOTEC PHARM LTD [IE], et al) [Y] 1-89 * page 134; claims 1-20; compound 48 *; | [Y]WO2009085978 (ENANTA PHARCEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-89 * claims 1, 5-15 *; | [A]US2008286233 (SUN YING [US], et al) [A] 1-89 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2009099596 (IDENIX PHARAMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-89 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5538865 | US5990276 | US6143715 | US6265380 | US6323180 | US6329379 | US6410531 | US6420380 | US6534523 | US6608027 | US6642204 | US6653295 | US6727366 | US6838475 | US6846802 | US6867185 | US6869964 | US6872805 | US6878722 | US6908901 | US6911428 | US6995174 | US7012066 | US7041698 | US7091184 | US7169760 | US7176208 | US7208600 | US7491794 | US2002016294 | US2002016442 | US2002032175 | US2002037998 | US2004229777 | US2005090450 | US2005153877 | US2005176648 | US2006046956 | US2007021330 | US2007021351 | US2007049536 | US2007054842 | US2007060510 | US2007060565 | US2007072809 | US2007078081 | US2007078122 | US2007093414 | US2007093430 | US2007099825 | US2007099929 | US2007105781 | US2008152622 | US2009035271 | US2009035272 | US2009111969 | US2009111982 | US2009123425 | US2009130059 | US2009148407 | US2009156800 | US2009169510 | US2009175822 | US2009180981 | WO9817679 | WO9822496 | WO9907734 | WO0009543 | WO0059929 | WO0208187 | WO0208251 | WO0208256 | WO0208198 | WO0248116 | WO0248157 | WO0248172 | WO02060926 | WO03053349 | WO03064416 | WO03064455 | WO03064456 | WO03066103 | WO03099274 | WO03099316 | WO2004032827 | WO2004043339 | WO2005037214 | WO2005037860 | WO2006000085 | WO2006119061 | WO2006122188 | WO2007001406 | WO2007014925 | WO2007014926 | WO2007015824 | WO2007056120 | WO2008019289 | WO2008021960 | WO2008022006 | WO2008086161 | WO2009053828 | WO2009058856 | WO2009073713 | WO2009073780 | WO2009080542 | WO2009082701 | WO2009082697 | WO2009085978 | US2009152622 | WO2009014730 | US4328245 | US4409239 | US4410545 | US6350458 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US3536809 | US3598123 | US4008719 | US5674533 | US5059595 | US5591767 | US5120548 | US5073543 | US5639476 | US5354556 | US5639480 | US5733566 | US5739108 | US5891474 | US5922356 | US5958458 | US5972891 | US5980945 | US5993855 | US6045830 | US6087324 | US6113943 | US6197350 | US6248363 | US6264970 | US6267981 | US6270798 | US6375987 | US6376461 | US6419961 | US6589548 | US6613358 | US6623756 | US6699500 | US6793936 | US6827947 | US6902742 | US6958161 | US7255876 | US7416738 | US7427414 | US7485322 | US5798119 | US5612059 | US5698220 | WO0217918 | US5709874 | US5759542 | US5840674 | US5900252 | US5972366 | US5985307 | US6004534 | US6039975 | US6048736 | US6060082 | US6071495 | US6120751 | US6131570 | US6139865 | US6253872 | US6271359 | US6274552 | US6316652 | US7169410 | DE19914474 | US6004933 | US5633358 | WO9736554 | WO03070750 | WO2005012525 | US2004209831 | JPH08268890 | JPH10101591 | US6043077 | US5869253 | US5610054 | US6660721 | US6777395 | US6784166 | US6846810 | US6927291 | US7094770 | US7105499 | US7125855 | US7202224 | US2004121980 | US2005009737 | US2005038240 | US2006040890 | WO9943691 | WO0132153 | WO0160315 | WO0179246 | WO0190121 | WO0192282 | WO0218404 | WO0232920 | WO0248165 | WO02057425 | WO02057287 | WO2004002422 | WO2004002999 | WO2004003000 | US6034134 | US5922757 | US5846964 | US5830905 | US5633388 | US5496546 | US5026687 | US5891874 | US5725859 | US5837257 | US6056961 | US5323907 | US5052558 | US5033252 | WO2007014919 | - KUO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 362 - 364 | - THOMAS, CURR. TOP. MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL., (2000), pages 25 - 41 | - DI BESCEGLIE ET AL., SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (199910), pages 80 - 85 | - BOYER ET AL., J HEPATOL., (2000), vol. 32, pages 98 - 112 | - KATO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 9524 - 9528 | - KATO, ACTA MEDICA OKAYAMA, (2001), vol. 55, pages 133 - 159 | - POYNARD ET AL., LANCET, (1998), vol. 352, pages 1426 - 1432 | - MANNS ET AL., LANCET, (2001), vol. 358, pages 958 - 965 | - FRIED ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2002), vol. 347, pages 975 - 982 | - HADZIYANNIS ET AL., ANN. INTERN. MED., (2004), vol. 140, pages 346 - 355 | - LLINAS-BRUNET ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1998), vol. 8, pages 1713 - 1718 | - STEINKUHLER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, pages 8899 - 8905 | - BERGE ET AL., J PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - HARPER, PROGRESS IN DRUG RESEARCH, (1962), vol. 4, pages 221 - 294 | - GANGWAR ET AL., DES. BIOPHARM. PROP. PRODRUGS ANALOGS, (1977), pages 409 - 421 | - BUNDGAARD, ARCH. PHARM. CHEM., (1979), vol. 86, pages 1 - 39 | - FARQUHAR ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1983), vol. 72, pages 324 - 325 | - WERNUTH ET AL., Drug Design: Fact or Fantasy, ACADEMIC PRCSS, (1984), pages 47 - 72 | - FLEISHER ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1985), vol. 112, pages 360 - 381 | - STELLA ET AL., DRUGS, (1985), vol. 29, pages 455 - 473 | - BUNDGAARD, CONTROLLED DRUG DELIVERY, (1987), vol. 17, pages 179 - 96 | - WALLER ET AL., BR. J. CLIN. PHARMAC., (1989), vol. 28, pages 497 - 507 | - BALANT ET AL., EUR. J. DRUG METAB. PHARMACOKINET., (1990), vol. 15, pages 143 - 53 | - FREEMAN ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC., CHEM. COMMUN., (1991), pages 875 - 877 | - BUNDGAARD, ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1992), vol. 8, pages 1 - 38 | - NATHWANI; WOOD, DRUGS, (1993), vol. 45, pages 866 - 94 | - FRIIS; BUNDGAARD, EUR. J. PHARM. SCI., (1996), vol. 4, pages 49 - 59 | - FLEISHER ET AL., ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1996), vol. 19, pages 115 - 130 | - SINHABABU; THAKKER, ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1996), vol. 19, pages 241 - 273 | - TAYLOR, ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1996), vol. 19, pages 131 - 148 | - GAIGNAULT ET AL., PRACT. MED. CHEM., (1996), pages 671 - 696 | - BROWNE, CLIN. NEUROPHARMACOL., (1997), vol. 20, pages 1 - 12 | - VALENTINO; BORCHARDT, DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (1997), vol. 2, pages 148 - 155 | - PAULETTI ET AL., ADV. DRUG. DELIVERY REV., (1997), vol. 27, pages 235 - 256 | - MIZEN ET AL., PHARM. BIOTECH., (1998), vol. 11, pages 345 - 365 | - WIEBE; KNAUS, ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1999), vol. 39, pages 63 - 80 | - TAN ET AL., ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1999), vol. 39, pages 117 - 151 | - BALIMANE; SINKO, ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1999), vol. 39, pages 183 - 209 | - WANG ET AL., CURR. PHARM. DESIGN, (1999), vol. 5, pages 265 - 287 | - HAN ET AL., AAPS PHARMSCI., (2000), vol. 2, pages 1 - 11 | - ASGHAMEJAD ET AL., Transport Processes in Pharmaceutical Systems, MARCCLL DCKKCR, (2000), pages 185 - 218 | - SINHA ET AL., PHARM. RES., (2001), vol. 18, pages 557 - 564 | - ANAND ET AL., EXPERT OPIN. BIOL. THER., (2002), vol. 2, pages 607 - 620 | - RAO, RESONACE, (2003), pages 19 - 27 | - SLOAN ET AL., MED. RES. REV., (2003), vol. 23, pages 763 - 793 | - PATTERSON ET AL., CURR. PHARM. DES., (2003), vol. 9, pages 2131 - 2154 | - HU, IDRUGS, (2004), vol. 7, pages 736 - 742 | - ROBINSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2004), vol. 101, pages 14527 - 14532 | - ERION ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2005), vol. 312, pages 554 - 560 | - FANG ET AL., CURR. DRUG DISCOV. TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 3, pages 211 - 224 | - STANCZAK ET AL., PHARMACOL. REP., (2006), vol. 58, pages 599 - 613 | - SLOAN ET AL., PHARM. RES., (2006), vol. 23, pages 2729 - 2747 | - STELLA ET AL., ADV. DRUG DELIV. REV., (2007), vol. 59, pages 677 - 694 | - GOMES ET AL., MOLECULES, (2007), vol. 12, pages 2484 - 2506 | - KRAFZ ET AL., CHEMMEDCHEM, (2008), vol. 3, pages 20 - 53 | - RAUTIO ET AL., AAPS J., (2008), vol. 10, pages 92 - 102 | - RAUTIO ET AL., NAT. REV. DRUG. DISCOV., (2008), vol. 7, pages 255 - 270 | - PAVAN ET AL., MOLECULES, (2008), vol. 13, pages 1035 - 1065 | - SANDROS ET AL., MOLECULES, (2008), vol. 13, pages 1156 - 1178 | - SINGH ET AL., CURR. MED. CHEM., (2008), vol. 15, pages 1802 - 1826 | - ONISHI ET AL., MOLECULES, (2008), vol. 13, pages 2136 - 2155 | - HUTTUNEN ET AL., CURR. MED. CHEM., (2008), vol. 15, pages 2346 - 2365 | - SERAFIN ET AL., MINI REV. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 9, pages 481 - 497 | - BUSSEMER ET AL., CRIT. REV. THER. DRUG CARRIER SYST., (2001), vol. 18, pages 433 - 458 | - MARONI ET AL., EXPERT. OPIN. DRUG DELIV., (2005), vol. 2, pages 855 - 871 | - SHI ET AL., EXPERT OPIN. DRUG DELIV., (2005), vol. 2, pages 1039 - 1058 | - BADAWY ET AL., J PHARM. SCI., (2007), vol. 9, pages 948 - 959 | - CONWAY, RECENT PAT. DRUG DELIV. FORMUL., (2008), vol. 2, pages 1 - 8 | - GAZZANIGA ET AL., EUR. J. PHARM. BIOPHARRN., (2008), vol. 68, pages 11 - 18 | - NAGARWAL ET AL., CURR. DRUG DELIV., (2008), vol. 5, pages 282 - 289 | - GALLARDO ET AL., PHARM. DEV. TECHNOL., (2008), vol. 13, pages 413 - 423 | - CHRZANOWSKI, AAPS PHARMSCITECH., (2008), vol. 9, pages 635 - 638 | - CHRZANOWSKI, AAPS PHARNISCITECH., (2008), vol. 9, pages 639 - 645 | - KALANTZI, RECENT PAT. DRUG DELIV. FORMUL., (2009), vol. 3, pages 49 - 63 | - SAIGAL ET AL., RECENT PAT. DRUG DELIV. FORMUL., (2009), vol. 3, pages 64 - 70 | - ROY ET AL., J. CONTROL RELEASE, (2009), vol. 134, pages 74 - 80 | - TAKADA ET AL., Encyclopedia of Controlled Drug Delivery, WILEY, (1999), vol. 2 | - SANTUS; BAKER, J. CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1995), vol. 35, pages 1 - 21 | - VERMA, DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY, (2000), vol. 26, pages 695 - 708 | - VERMA ET AL., J. CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2002), vol. 79, pages 7 - 27 | - ATTWOOD ET AL., ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 259 - 273 | - SUDO ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1997), vol. 238, pages 643 - 647 | - CHU ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1996), vol. 37, pages 7229 - 7232 | - CHU ET AL., BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1999), vol. 9, pages 1949 - 1952 | - QASIM ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 1598 - 1607 | - STEINKIIHLER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, pages 8899 - 8905 | - SUDO ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 32, pages 9 - 18 | - KAKIUCHI ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1998), vol. 421, pages 217 - 220 | - TAKESHITA ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 247, pages 242 - 246 | - FERRARI ET AL., JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1999), vol. 73, pages 1649 - 1654 | - LOHMANN ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 249, pages 108 - 118 | - ALT ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1995), vol. 22, pages 707 - 717 | - ALT ET AL., ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, (1997), vol. 142, pages 589 - 599 | - GALDERISI ET AL., JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 181, pages 251 - 257 | - TAREMI ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 7, pages 2143 - 2149 | - WAKITA ET AL., NAT. MED., (2005), vol. 11, pages 791 - 796 | - ZHONG ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2005), vol. 102, pages 9294 - 9299 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2006), vol. 71, pages 8864 - 8875 | US20090149662 | US20090231408 | US20090365127 | US20090167847 | US20090231600 |