Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE45754E | Global Dossier | 13.10.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | US201414226276 | 26.03.2014 | US54411309 | 19.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8315093 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2012 | B2 | US2012140559 | 07.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54411309 | 19.08.2009 | US201213397428 | 15.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101661295B | Global Dossier | 29.09.2016 | B1 | KR20120066019 | 21.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US45744 | 17.08.2010 | US54411309 | 19.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5575244B | Global Dossier | 20.08.2014 | B2 | JP2013502668 | 24.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US45744 | 17.08.2010 | US54411309 | 19.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102763166B | Global Dossier | 29.04.2015 | B | CN102763166 | 31.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US45744 | 17.08.2010 | US54411309 | 19.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2467854 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2015 | B8 | EP2467854 | 25.02.2015 | B1 | EP2467854 | 27.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US45744 | 17.08.2010 | US54411309 | 19.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011022386 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54411309 | 19.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8144511 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2012 | B2 | US2011044102 | 24.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54411309 | 19.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201140598 | 16.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US54411309 | 19.08.2009 |