EP2403232 - IMAGING DEVICE AND IMAGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Junji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10746109.7 | 16.02.2010 | WO2010JP52241 | Priority number, date | JP20090045495 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009045495 | [2012/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010098228 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2403232 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, G03B5/00, G03B37/00, H04N5/232, H04N101/00 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
G03B37/00 (EP,US);
H04N23/68 (EP,US);
H04N23/631 (EP,US);
H04N23/633 (EP,US);
H04N23/687 (EP,US);
H04N23/695 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Title | German: | ABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ABBILDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2012/01] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE AND IMAGING METHOD | [2012/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2011 | Translation filed | 03.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 18.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2000184265 (SONY CORP) [I] 1-10,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] *; | [A]JP2007214620 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-10,13* the whole document *; | [I]JP2008271529 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [I] 1-10,13 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0194] - paragraph [0196] * | International search | [Y]JP2000184265 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2001285702 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2007214620 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2008271529 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | by applicant | JPH1188754 |