EP2402152 - METAL-CLAD POLYIMIDE RESIN SUBSTRATE WITH EXCELLENT THERMAL AGING RESISTANCE CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8164 / JP | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA Taku c/o JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation Shirogane Plant 3-3-1 Shirogane-cho Hitachi-city Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | 02 /
INAZUMI Hajime c/o JX Nippon Mining&Metals Corporation Shirogane Plant 3-3-1 Shirogane-cho Hitachi-city Ibaraki 317-0056 / JP | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/01] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 10746117.0 | 17.02.2010 | WO2010JP52299 | Priority number, date | JP20090041815 | 25.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009041815 | [2012/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010098236 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2402152 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/088, C25D5/56 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
B32B15/20 (EP,US);
B32B15/088 (KR);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/281 (EP,US);
C25D5/56 (KR);
H05K3/388 (EP,US);
B32B2255/205 (EP,US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
C25D5/34 (EP,US);
H05K1/0346 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Title | German: | METALLKASCHIERTES POLYIMIDHARZSUBSTRAT MIT HERVORRAGENDER WÄRMEALTERUNGSRESISTENZ | [2012/01] | English: | METAL-CLAD POLYIMIDE RESIN SUBSTRATE WITH EXCELLENT THERMAL AGING RESISTANCE CHARACTERISTICS | [2012/01] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE RÉSINE POLYIMIDE MÉTALLISÉ AYANT D'EXCELLENTES PROPRIÉTÉS DE RÉSISTANCE AU VIEILLISSEMENT THERMIQUE | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2011 | Translation filed | 05.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 07.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003224187 (SAEKI NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] *; | [A] - T. Grehl, "Improvements in TOF-SIMS Instrumentation for Analytical Application and Fundamental Research", University of Munster, Germany, (20030410), pages 1 - 100, URL: http://repositorium.uni-muenster.de/document/miami/f860589a-cceb-4243-9987-a437c57e9e4b/dissertation_thomas_grehl.pdf, (20140227), XP002720986 [A] 1-3 * page 7 - page 19; figures 1, 2 * | International search | [Y]JP2008162245 (TORAY ADVANCED FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003334890 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) | by applicant | JP3173511B | JP2003519901 | JP2005154895 | JP2007318177 |