EP2381365 - PROCESS ALLOCATION SYSTEM, PROCESS ALLOCATION METHOD, PROCESS ALLOCATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 05.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEMURA Kenji c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10746273.1 | 25.02.2010 | WO2010JP52987 | Priority number, date | JP20090045875 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009045875 | [2011/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010098394 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2381365 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
G06F9/5066 (EP,US);
G06F9/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROZESSZUORDNUNGSSYSTEM, PROZESSZUORDNUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROZESSZUORDNUNGSPROGRAMM | [2011/43] | English: | PROCESS ALLOCATION SYSTEM, PROCESS ALLOCATION METHOD, PROCESS ALLOCATION PROGRAM | [2011/43] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ATTRIBUTION DE PROCESSUS, PROCÉDÉ D'ATTRIBUTION DE PROCESSUS, PROGRAMME D'ATTRIBUTION DE PROCESSUS | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2011 | Translation filed | 20.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 02.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/45] | 04.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2018 | 10.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005071843 (GUO HONG [CA], et al) [I] 1-7 * page 2, paragraphs 0013, 0014, 0021 * * page 3, paragraphs 0019, 0024 * * page 5, paragraphs 0060, 0061 * * page 7, paragraph 0081 * * page 8, paragraphs 0098, 0099, 0100 ** page 9, paragraphs 0101, 0104 * | International search | [Y]JP2009020797 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2006146865 (RAYTHEON CO) | Examination | - Shih Kuo ET AL, "Intel 64 Architecture Processor Topology Enumeration | Intel Developer Zone", Internet, (20120127), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://software.intel.com/en-us/articles/intel-64-architecture-processor-topology-enumeration, (20131216), XP055093525 | by applicant | JP2003015883 | JP2009045875 |