EP2448440 - PROTECTIVE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grosstesner, Herbert Schenkermühlestrasse 21 4565 Inzersdorf im Kremstal / AT | [2013/16] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Grosstesner, Herbert Lauterbach 390 4560 Inzersdorf im Kremstal / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2013/18] |
Former [2012/19] | Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte Est. Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | Application number, filing date | 10747139.3 | 02.07.2010 | WO2010AT00242 | Priority number, date | AT20090001038 | 02.07.2009 Original published format: AT 10382009 | [2012/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011000017 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2448440 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2448440 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/05 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A41D13/0506 (EP,US);
A41D13/0156 (EP,US);
A41D13/0525 (EP,US);
A41D13/0537 (EP,US);
A41D31/12 (EP,US);
A41D13/0158 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZELEMENT | [2012/19] | English: | PROTECTIVE ELEMENT | [2012/19] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE PROTECTION | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 16.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2010 | AL | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | HR | 01.05.2013 | IT | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | MK | 01.05.2013 | MT | 01.05.2013 | NL | 01.05.2013 | PL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | SM | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | IE | 02.07.2013 | LU | 02.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | NO | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 02.07.2010 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MK | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 02.07.2013 | ||
LU | 02.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MK | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 02.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
SM | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 02.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 02.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
NO | 01.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0564246 (PARKER A BRUCE [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, lines 48,49 * * page 4, line 57 - page 5, line 11; figure 4 *; | [Y]US5337418 (KATO KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,13,14* abstract *; | [XY]US7003803 (LYDEN ROBERT M [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-12,15 * column 3, lines 50-58 * * column 16, lines 29-37 * * column 17, lines 33-39 * * column 18, lines 5-33 * * column 21, lines 52-64; figures 13,15,22 * [Y] 5,13,14; | [X]WO2006029486 (KRIWIN PHILIPPE [BE]) [X] 1,2,6-10,15 * page 1, paragraph 6 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, lines 21-27 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 7; figure 3 * |