EP2473664 - A WASHING MACHINE COMPRISING A CLEANING AGENT DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENCER, Mehtap E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
ALPTEKIN, Ahmet E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/28] | Application number, filing date | 10747217.7 | 27.08.2010 | WO2010EP62591 | Priority number, date | TR20090006688 | 31.08.2009 Original published format: TR 200906688 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011023808 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2473664 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/02 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
D06F39/02 (EP,US);
D06F39/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | WASCHMASCHINE MIT EINEM REINIGUNGSMITTELSPENDER | [2012/28] | English: | A WASHING MACHINE COMPRISING A CLEANING AGENT DISPENSER | [2012/28] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER À DISTRIBUTEUR D'AGENT DE NETTOYAGE | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 12.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1607508 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0084]; figures 6-11 * [I] 6-10; | [X]GB2187764 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 22 - page 2, line 79; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US2007125134 (PARK SEON H [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0080]; figures 6-9 * | by applicant | KR20000014316 |