EP2494532 - ALARM DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND COMMUNICATING ENVIRONMENT- AND SYSTEM-SPECIFIC STATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OPPELT, Ulrich Obere Bahnhofstr. 40 85604 Zorneding / DE | 02 /
SIBER, Bernd Glonner Strasse 4 85625 Baiern-Antholing / DE | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 10747635.0 | 31.08.2010 | [2018/41] | WO2010EP62722 | Priority number, date | DE20091046096 | 28.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009046096 | [2012/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011051022 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2494532 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494532 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/10, G08B27/00 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
G08B25/10 (EP,US);
G08B27/005 (US)
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | G08B25/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALARMEINRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG UND MITTEILUNG VON UMGEBUNGS- UND ANLAGENSPEZIFISCHEN ZUSTÄNDEN | [2012/36] | English: | ALARM DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND COMMUNICATING ENVIRONMENT- AND SYSTEM-SPECIFIC STATES | [2012/36] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALARME POUR DÉTECTER ET SIGNALER DES ÉTATS SPÉCIFIQUES À L'ENVIRONNEMENT ET AUX INSTALLATIONS | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 22.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2010 | AL | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | IT | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | MT | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | PL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | SM | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 31.08.2010 | |
AL | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
MT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.08.2010 | |
AL | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 10.10.2018 | |
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 10.10.2018 | |
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0137589 (TRIGUARD GROUP LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 1-12 * * page 12, paragraphs 10,11 * * page 13, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 16, paragraph 2 * * page 19, paragraph 1 *[I] 2-11; | [XI]US2007063833 (KATES LAWRENCE [US]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 1-10 * * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 26 * * page 3, paragraphs 27,29,35 * * page 4, paragraph 35 * [I] 2-11 | Examination | WO0193220 | DE10034192 | US2005116830 | WO2007133829 | GB2453602 | by applicant | US7019646 |