EP2451669 - VENT VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114 / US | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIFER, Daniel, Lee 1587 Nathans Trail Chelsea MI 48118 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Charles, Joseph 2405 Newlyn Drive Dexter MI 48130 / US | 03 /
BENJEY, Robert 7535 Walsh Road Dexter MI 48130 / US | 04 /
MCINTOSH, Andrew 4020 N. Ashland Avenue Apartment 5 Chicago IL 60613 / US | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10747663.2 | 06.07.2010 | WO2010IB01665 | Priority number, date | US20090498451 | 07.07.2009 Original published format: US 498451 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011004246 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2451669 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/035 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
B60K15/03519 (EP,US);
B60K15/035 (KR);
F16K24/04 (KR);
F16K31/22 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03289 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03585 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | LÜFTUNGSVENTIL | [2012/20] | English: | VENT VALVE | [2012/20] | French: | SOUPAPE D'ÉVACUATION D'AIR | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 25.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1236605 (STANT MFG INC [US]) [X] 1-16,20,21 * figure - *; | [X]US2006042690 (AOKI TOMOHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,17-22 * figure 5 *; | [X]US2006231138 (DEVALL JEFFREY E [US]) [X] 1,20* figure - * |