Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8662434 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2014 | B2 | US2012181365 | 19.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010DE00863 | 23.07.2010 | DE102009056825 | 04.12.2009 | DE102009037509 | 17.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2467015 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | B1 | EP2467015 | 27.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010DE00863 | 23.07.2010 | DE102009056825 | 04.12.2009 | DE102009037509 | 17.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2770344 | 22.04.2014 | C | CA2770344 | 24.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010DE00863 | 23.07.2010 | DE102009056825 | 04.12.2009 | DE102009037509 | 17.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2467015T | 14.12.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010DE00863 | 23.07.2010 | DE102009056825 | 04.12.2009 | DE102009037509 | 17.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011020453 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009056825 | 04.12.2009 | DE102009037509 | 17.08.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009056825 | 16.05.2013 | B4 | DE102009056825 | 05.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009056825 | 04.12.2009 | DE102009037509 | 17.08.2009 |