EP2471149 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR HAVING AN ELECTRICALLY PARALLEL COMPENSATION REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Commscope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | ||
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | ||
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states TE Connectivity Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn PA 19312 / US | ||
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 1050 Westlakes Drive Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOPP, Steven, Richard 3835 Windstream Way Jamestown, NC 27282 / US | 02 /
PEPE, Paul, John 1812 Kilrush Road Clemmons, NC 27012 / US | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10747972.7 | 19.08.2010 | [2016/13] | WO2010US02285 | Priority number, date | US20090547245 | 25.08.2009 Original published format: US 547245 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011025527 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471149 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2471149 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6464, H01R13/6466, H01R13/6467, H01R13/6477, H01R13/66, H01R24/00, H01R24/58, H01R24/64 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
H01R13/6466 (EP,US);
H01R13/6464 (EP,US);
H01R13/6477 (EP,US);
H01R13/6658 (EP,US);
H01R24/00 (EP,US);
H01R24/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/27] | H01R24/58, H01R13/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER MIT ELEKTRISCH PARALLELEM KOMPENSATIONSBEREICH | [2015/33] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR HAVING AN ELECTRICALLY PARALLEL COMPENSATION REGION | [2012/27] | French: | CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE AVEC UNE ETENDUE DE COMPENSATION ELECTRIQUE PARALLELE | [2015/33] |
Former [2012/27] | ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBUNDER MIT ELEKTRISCH PARALLELEM KOMPENSATIONSBEREICH | ||
Former [2012/27] | CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE DOTÉ D UNE ZONE DE COMPENSATION ÉLECTRIQUEMENT PARALLÈLE | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 28.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2010 | AL | 30.03.2016 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | IE | 19.08.2016 | LU | 19.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 19.08.2016 | ||
LU | 19.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1596478 (COMMSCOPE SOLUTIONS PROPERTIES [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US6231397 (DE LA BORBOLLA IAN RUBIN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 8, line 28 - column 15, line 51 * * figures 1,2,6-21 *; | [I]US6443777 (MCCURDY ALAN H [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1406354 (AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XD]EP0901201 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 6-7F *; | [XPI]WO2009131640 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1-3,6-15 * the whole document * [I] 4,5 | by applicant | US5997358 | US20090547321 | US20090547211 | US20080190920 | US20080109544 |