EP2462441 - METHOD OF DETECTING OXIDES OF NITROGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENON, Vinod, P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/47] |
Former [2012/24] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10748163.2 | 03.08.2010 | [2016/47] | WO2010US44240 | Priority number, date | US20090231257P | 04.08.2009 Original published format: US 231257 P | US20100369933P | 02.08.2010 Original published format: US 369933 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011017317 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2462441 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2462441 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
G01N33/523 (EP,US);
G01N33/526 (EP,US);
G01N2800/26 (EP,US);
Y10T436/17 (EP,US);
Y10T436/173076 (EP,US);
Y10T436/177692 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON STICKSTOFFOXIDEN | [2012/24] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTING OXIDES OF NITROGEN | [2012/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'OXYDES D'AZOTE | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.05.2016 | 31.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2010 | AL | 23.11.2016 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | GB | 03.08.2017 | IE | 03.08.2017 | LU | 03.08.2017 | MT | 03.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.08.2010 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.08.2017 | ||
LU | 03.08.2017 | ||
MT | 03.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 03.08.2010 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.08.2017 | ||
LU | 03.08.2017 | ||
MT | 03.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.08.2010 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.08.2017 | ||
LU | 03.08.2017 | ||
MT | 03.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.08.2010 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.08.2017 | ||
LU | 03.08.2017 | ||
MT | 03.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.08.2017 | ||
LU | 03.08.2017 | ||
MT | 03.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.08.2017 | ||
LU | 03.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 03.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.08.2017 | ||
LU | 03.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
IE | 03.08.2017 | ||
LU | 03.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2442748 (MOLOGIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7,15,16 * page 5 - page 6 * [I] 4,5,8-14,17-22; | [XY]US2007048182 (SONG XUEDONG [US], et al) [X] 15,16,18 * claims 1-36 * [Y] 1-14,17-22; | [XY]WO2006079167 (SYSTEM TWO PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 15,16 * claim 41 * [Y] 1-14,17-22; | [XY]GB1282653 (ELFAST ROYAL ALBERT JR [SE]) [X] 15,16,18 * page 1 - page 3 * [Y] 1-14,17-22; | [XY]US4434235 (RABI TAVASSA [IL], et al) [X] 15,16 * example 1 * [Y] 1-14,17-22 | [XY] - GU XUEXIN ET AL, "Determination of trace nitrite ion in water by spectrophotometric method after preconcentration on an organic solvent: Soluble membrane filter", TALANTA, (1996), vol. 43, no. 2, ISSN 0039-9140, pages 169 - 175, XP002602788 [X] 15,16 * page 171 - page 174 * [Y] 1-14,17-22 | [XY] - CAPITAN-VALLVEY L F ET AL, "Test strip for determination of nitrite in water", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (200207), vol. 373, no. 4-5, ISSN 1618-2642, pages 289 - 294, XP002602789 [X] 15,16 * page 291 - page 293 * [Y] 1-14,17-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00216-002-1320-0 | Examination | - SALIH SOMUNCU ET AL, "Protective effects of trapidil in lung after abdominal aorta induced ischemia-reperfusion injury: an experimental study", PEDIATRIC SURGERY INTERNATIONAL, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20051201), vol. 21, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S00383-005-1542-2, ISSN 1437-9813, pages 983 - 988, XP019339872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00383-005-1542-2 | - Katrina M. Miranda ET AL, "A Rapid, Simple Spectrophotometric Method for Simultaneous Detection of Nitrate and Nitrite", Nitric Oxide, (20010201), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1006/niox.2000.0319, ISSN 1089-8603, pages 62 - 71, XP055117002 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/niox.2000.0319 | - Evan M. Hetrick ET AL, "Analytical Chemistry of Nitric Oxide", Annual Review of Analytical Chemistry, (20090719), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1146/annurev-anchem-060908-155146, ISSN 1936-1327, pages 409 - 433, XP055117001 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-anchem-060908-155146 | by applicant | - "Comparison of fifty-two spectrophotometric methods for the determination of nitrite", E. SAWICKI ET AL., Talanta, PERGAMON PRESS LTD., (1963), vol. 10, pages 641 - 655 | - "The chemical reduction of nitrate in aqueous solution", J.C. FANNING, Coordination Chemistry Reviews, ELSEVIER, (2000), vol. 199, pages 159 - 179 | US20090231236 |