EP2405034 - COPPER-ZINC ALLOY ELECTROPLATING BATH AND METHOD OF PLATING USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADA, Yukiko c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center 3-1-1 Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-0031 / JP | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/49] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/02] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10748805.8 | 04.03.2010 | WO2010JP53524 | Priority number, date | JP20090050438 | 04.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009050438 | [2012/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010101212 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2405034 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/58 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C25D3/58 (EP,KR,US);
C25D7/0607 (KR);
Y10T428/12493 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Title | German: | ELEKTROPLATTIERUNGSBAD AUS EINER KUPFER-ZINK-LEGIERUNG UND PLATTIERUNGSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2012/02] | English: | COPPER-ZINC ALLOY ELECTROPLATING BATH AND METHOD OF PLATING USING SAME | [2012/02] | French: | BAIN D'ÉLECTRO-PLACAGE D'ALLIAGE DE CUIVRE ET DE ZINC ET PROCÉDÉ DE PLACAGE AU MOYEN DE CELUI-CI | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2011 | Translation filed | 07.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 02.04.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2002043467 (MORRISSEY DENIS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,10 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0030] , [0033] - [0044] * [Y] 4,8,11 [I] 5,9; | [IY]EP0752484 (PIRELLI [IT]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, lines 6-9 * * page 2, lines 39-43 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 15 * * pages 5-10; examples 1-6 * [Y] 4,8,11 | International search | [X]US6974767 (LOPATIN SERGEY [US]); | [A]JPH0320478B (OSAKA-SHI); | [A]JPH09217193 (GOULD ELECTRONICS INC) | by applicant | JPH0598496 | JPH0320478B |