EP2404153 - FATIGUE TESTING SYSTEM FOR PROSTHETIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomedical Device Consultants And Laboratories Of Colorado, LLC 4060 Youngfield Street Wheat Ridge, CO 80033 / US | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCLOSKEY, Benjamin 29726 Bronco Road Evergreen, CO 80439 / US | 02 /
WEINBERG, Craig 4132 Decatur Street Denver, CO 80211 / US | 03 /
WEINBERG, Steven 916 Davis Road League City, TX 77573 / US | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10749376.9 | 05.03.2010 | WO2010US26329 | Priority number, date | US20090158185P | 06.03.2009 Original published format: US 158185 P | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010102185 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2404153 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/36, G01N3/10, G01M19/00, A61F2/02 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
G01N3/32 (EP,US);
G01M99/007 (US);
A61B90/06 (EP,US);
A61F2/2472 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0089 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0204 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Title | German: | ERSCHÖPFUNGSTESTSYSTEM FÜR PROTHESENVORRICHTUNGEN | [2012/02] | English: | FATIGUE TESTING SYSTEM FOR PROSTHETIC DEVICES | [2012/02] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ESSAI DE FATIGUE POUR DISPOSITIFS PROTHÉTIQUES | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 06.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2012 | 31.03.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4682491 (PICKARD MURPHY L [US]) [X] 1,3-12 * column 1, lines 6-9 * * column 3, lines 1-4 * * column 8, lines 28-32 * * column 9, lines 5-19 * * column 9, lines 19-25 * * column 9, lines 43-45 * * column 12, line 36 - column 13, line 9 * * column 14, lines 16-33 * * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 11 * * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * figure 8 * * column 12, lines 2-7 * [I] 2,13-15; | [A]US5176153 (EBERHARDT ALLEN C [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5531094 (MORE ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2003066338 (MICHALSKY DOUGLAS L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2007185534 (CONTI JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 ** figure 1 * | International search | [A]US4450710 (NETTEKOVEN WILLIAM S [US]); | [Y]JPH0886728 (SHINAGAWA TSUSHIN KEISO SERVIC); | [Y]US5670708 (VILENDRER KENT [US]); | [X]US6881224 (KRUSE STEVEN D [US], et al) | by applicant | US4682491 |