EP2488901 - CONCENTRATOR FOR SOLAR ENERGY GENERATION AND THE PRODUCTION THEREOF FROM POLYMERIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUMRICH, Uwe Schillerstraße 37a 64846 Groß-Zimmern / DE | 02 /
ARNDT, Thomas Obernburger Straße 3 64750 Lützelbach / DE | 03 /
ARNOLD, Werner Schlossgraben 28 64850 Schaafheim / DE | 04 /
OLBRICH, Michael Händelstraße 8 63791 Karlstein / DE | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/34] | Application number, filing date | 10749863.6 | 07.09.2010 | WO2010EP63065 | Priority number, date | DE20091045582 | 12.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009045582 | [2012/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011045121 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2488901 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/10, F24J2/10, F24J2/14 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
G02B5/10 (EP,US);
F24S23/74 (EP,US);
F24S23/82 (EP,US);
G02B1/10 (KR);
G02B5/08 (KR);
F24S2025/601 (EP,US);
Y02E10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | KONZENTRATOR FÜR DIE SOLARE ENERGIEGEWINNUNG UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG AUS POLYMEREN WERKSTOFFEN | [2012/34] | English: | CONCENTRATOR FOR SOLAR ENERGY GENERATION AND THE PRODUCTION THEREOF FROM POLYMERIC MATERIALS | [2012/34] | French: | CONCENTRATEUR POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE ET SA FABRICATION À PARTIR DE MATÉRIAUX POLYMÈRES | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 06.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5177977 (LARSEN THEODORE E [US]) [Y] 1-22 * figures 10,11 * * column 10, lines 10-51 *; | [Y]AU2004243336 (CONNOR PHILIP) [Y] 1-22 * figures 1, 3 ** page 8, lines 3-8 *; | [Y]WO2007108861 (GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * figures 9, 11, 12 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0016] , [0042] , [0054] , [0065] *; | [Y]US2009056790 (TIAN JING [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0018] *; | [Y]US2009101208 (VANDAL ROBERT A [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * figures 9,11,12 * * paragraphs [0077] , [0103] *; | [Y] - Anonymous, "Plexiglas, general information and physical properties", (2006), pages 1 - 20, Altuglas International, URL: http://www.plexiglas.com/literature/pdf/80.pdf, (20100928), XP002602419 [Y] 1-22 * table 1 * * pages 3-5,7 * | by applicant | US4645714 | US5118540 | WO0022462 | EP1771687 | WO2007076282 | WO2007073952 | US2008093753 | DE102007029263 |