EP2475959 - BIAXIAL, SHOCK-ROBUST ROTATION RATE SENSOR HAVING LINEAR AND ROTATING SEISMIC ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/29] | DOUBLE-AXIAL, IMPACT-RESISTANT YAW RATE SENSOR COMPRISING LINEAR AND ROTATORY SEISMIC ELEMENTS | ||
[2015/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMID, Bernhard Altkönigstraße 24 61169 Friedberg / DE | 02 /
GÜNTHNER, Stefan Hausener Weg 9 60489 Frankfurt / DE | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/29] | Application number, filing date | 10749889.1 | 09.09.2010 | WO2010EP63248 | Priority number, date | DE20091029310 | 09.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009029310 | DE20091029311 | 09.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009029311 | [2012/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011029878 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2475959 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2475959 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56, G01C19/574 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G01C19/574 (EP,KR,US);
G01C19/5642 (KR,US);
G01C19/5719 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/29] | G01C19/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELAXIALER, SCHOCKROBUSTER, DREHRATENSENSOR MIT LINEAREN UND ROTATORISCHEN SEISMISCHEN ELEMENTEN | [2012/29] | English: | BIAXIAL, SHOCK-ROBUST ROTATION RATE SENSOR HAVING LINEAR AND ROTATING SEISMIC ELEMENTS | [2015/11] | French: | CAPTEUR DE VITESSE DE ROTATION À DOUBLE AXE AVEC ÉLEMENTS SISMIQUES LINÉAIRES ET ROTATIFS | [2015/11] |
Former [2012/29] | DOUBLE-AXIAL, IMPACT-RESISTANT YAW RATE SENSOR COMPRISING LINEAR AND ROTATORY SEISMIC ELEMENTS | ||
Former [2012/29] | CAPTEUR DE VITESSE DE ROTATION BI-AXIAL RÉSISTANT AUX CHOCS, POURVU D'ÉLÉMENTS SISMIQUES LINÉAIRES ET ROTATIFS | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 09.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2010 | AL | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | HR | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | MK | 08.07.2015 | MT | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | PL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | SM | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | IE | 09.09.2015 | LU | 09.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | NO | 08.10.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.09.2010 | |
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 09.09.2015 | ||
LU | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 09.09.2010 | |
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 09.09.2015 | ||
LU | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 09.09.2015 | ||
LU | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 09.09.2015 | ||
LU | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 09.09.2015 | ||
LU | 09.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
LU | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
LU | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
LU | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 08.07.2015 | |
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 08.07.2015 | |
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102007012163 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10,12,14 * paragraph [0079]; figure 15 * [I] 3,11,13; | [XI]DE102007054505 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0045]; figure 1 * [I] 14; | [XI]DE10300682 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0232] - [0256]; figure 20 * [I] 14; | [XI]JP2007108044 (NEC TOKIN CORP) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039]; figures 4-6 * [I] 14 | by applicant | WO2006070059 | WO2006113162 | WO2004097432 | WO2008021534 | DE102006052522 | DE102005051048 | US6892575 | EP1832841 | WO2008051677 | EP1918723 | WO9817973 |