EP2475889 - ROTARY PISTON PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hugo Vogelsang Maschinenbau GmbH Holthöge 10-14 49632 Essen / DE | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMPE, Paul Kösliner Str. 17 49632 Essen /Olbg / DE | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2017/22] |
Former [2012/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/29] | Birken, Lars Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10750126.4 | 08.09.2010 | [2017/22] | WO2010EP63179 | Priority number, date | DE20092012158U | 08.09.2009 Original published format: DE 202009012158 U | [2012/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011029847 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2475889 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2475889 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/08, F04C2/12, F04C13/00 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
F04C2/126 (EP,US);
F04C13/001 (EP,US);
F04C2/086 (EP,US);
F04C2210/24 (EP,US);
F04C2250/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2012/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHKOLBENPUMPE | [2012/29] | English: | ROTARY PISTON PUMP | [2012/29] | French: | POMPE À PISTONS ROTATIFS | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 08.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2010 | AL | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | HR | 31.05.2017 | LT | 31.05.2017 | LV | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | MK | 31.05.2017 | MT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | SM | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | LU | 08.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MK | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.09.2010 | |
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 31.05.2017 | |
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
MT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | EE | 31.05.2017 | |
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
LU | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | EE | 31.05.2017 | |
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | EE | 31.05.2017 | |
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SM | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | EE | 31.05.2017 | |
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 31.05.2017 | |
HR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | HR | 31.05.2017 | |
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
LV | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | HR | 31.05.2017 | |
LT | 31.05.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE2543593 (ATOM CHEM PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [Y] 2,8-13,15 [I] 6,7; | [XY]WO2009039881 (MAAG PUMP SYSTEMS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XYI]US6099277 (PATEL AJITKUMAR G [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13,15 [I] 6,7; | [XYI]DE10239558 (SCHWAEBISCHE HUETTENWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13,15 [I] 6,7; | [XY]GB856706 (RAYMOND DE MICHELIS) [X] 14 * the whole document * * page 2, line 45 - line 59 * [Y] 2,8-13,15; | [XY]DE4218855 (CARL ENKE GMBH PUMPEN UND GEBL [DE]) [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]DE1553120 (MEULENAERE JOSEF) [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]US3039398 (DE MICHELIS RAYMOND) [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]FR1492841 (DE MICHELIS, RAYMOND JOSEPH FERDINAND) [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]FR2239138 (BAUDOINO MARIO [FR]) [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13,15; | [XY]GB901266 (CLAUDE BEDOUET) [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 8-13,15; | [YA]WO9314314 (SNELL HYDRO DESIGN CONSULTANCY [GB]) [Y] 8-13,15 * the whole document * [A] 1 | by applicant | DE29723984U | DE3427282 | US2848952 | NL1016283C | US3126834 | US15221 | DE202005010467U | DE202006020113U |