EP2405895 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A FATTY ACID OIL MIXTURE COMPRISING EPA AND DHA IN FREE ACID FORM AND A SURFACTANT, AND METHODS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF AS P.O. Box 420 1327 Lysaker / NO | [2018/51] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Pronova BioPharma Norge AS P.O. Box 420 1327 Lysaker / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSTVEDT, Svein, Olaf Bolerveien 16 G 0690 Oslo / NO | 02 /
OLESEN, Preben, Houlberg Orevadsvej 20 2400 Kobenhavn Nv / DK | 03 /
BERGE, Gunnar Skoyenveien 5D 0357 Oslo / NO | 04 /
KLAVENESS, Jo Erik, Johnsrud Midtasen 5 1166 Oslo / NO | [2020/35] |
Former [2012/03] | 01 /
HUSTVEDT, Svein, Olaf Bolerveien 16 G N-0690 Oslo / NO | ||
02 /
OLESEN, Preben, Houlberg Orevadsvej 20 DK-2400 Kobenhavn Nv / DK | |||
03 /
BERGE, Gunnar Skoyenveien 5D N-0357 Oslo / NO | |||
04 /
KLAVENESS, Jo Erik, Johnsrud Midtasen 5 N-1166 Oslo / NO | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2021/19] |
Former [2013/33] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/03] | Lillegraven, Rita, et al Zacco Norway AS Patent Department Haakon VII's gt. 2 P.O. Box 2003 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 10750436.7 | 09.03.2010 | [2021/19] | WO2010IB00791 | Priority number, date | US20090158613P | 09.03.2009 Original published format: US 158613 P | US20090254291P | 23.10.2009 Original published format: US 254291 P | US20090242630P | 15.09.2009 Original published format: US 242630 P | US20090254293P | 23.10.2009 Original published format: US 254293 P | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010103402 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2405895 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2405895 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/202, A61K9/107, A61K9/20, A61K9/66, A61P9/00, A61P7/00 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/232 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/201 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/557 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6801 (EP);
A61K47/6803 (EP);
A61K47/68031 (EP);
A61K47/6851 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/20 (US);
A61K9/4825 (US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,KR,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/03] | A61K9/107, A61K31/202, A61K31/557, A61K9/20, A61K9/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINER FETTSÄURE-ÖL-MISCHUNG MIT EPA UND DHA IN FREIER SÄUREFORM UND EINEM TENSID SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2012/03] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A FATTY ACID OIL MIXTURE COMPRISING EPA AND DHA IN FREE ACID FORM AND A SURFACTANT, AND METHODS AND USES THEREOF | [2012/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT UN MÉLANGE OLÉAGINEUX À BASE D'ACIDES GRAS COMPORTANT DE L'EPA ET DU DHA SOUS FORME D'ACIDE LIBRE ET UN TENSIOACTIF, ET PROCÉDÉS ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉS | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 16.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.11.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2010 | AT | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | CZ | 12.05.2021 | DK | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | FI | 12.05.2021 | HR | 12.05.2021 | IT | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | MK | 12.05.2021 | MT | 12.05.2021 | NL | 12.05.2021 | PL | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | SE | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | SM | 12.05.2021 | TR | 12.05.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 09.03.2010 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
TR | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 09.03.2010 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 09.03.2010 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 09.03.2010 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5502077 (BREIVIK HARALD [NO], et al) [X] 1-8,26,28 * claims 1-12 *; | [X]WO9929316 (SEVERSON MARY L [US], et al) [X] 1,4-9,11,16,26-29,31,37 * page 8, lines 1-5 * * page 16, lines 14-17 * * page 27, lines 9-13 *; | [X]WO9956727 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE], et al) [X] 1,4-9,11,16,26-29,31,37 * page 10 - page 11 * * claim 1 * * page 36; examples 2, 3 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 25; table 11 *; | [X]EP1157692 (QUATEX NV [AN]) [X] 1-8,26,28 * claims 1-5, 21 * * paragraph [0051] *; | [X]WO2005060954 (PRONOVA BIOCARE AS [NO], et al) [X] 32-35 * claims 1-8 * * page 29; example 5 *; | [X]WO2005123061 (TILLOTTS PHARMA AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,11,24,32-35 * page 21, lines 21-31 * * page 23, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO2008002121 (HOVID BERHAD [MY], et al)[A] 1-38; | [A]WO2008113177 (CT DE RECH SUR LES BIOTECHNOLO [CA], et al) [A] 1-38 | International search | [Y]GB2033745 (WELLCOME FOUND); | [Y]US4843095 (RUBIN DAVID [US]); | [Y]US5501077 (DAVIS S SPENCE [US], et al); | [Y]WO9929316 (SEVERSON MARY L [US], et al); | [Y]WO9929335 (CHONG KUN DANG CORP [KR], et al); | [Y]WO9956727 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE], et al); | [Y]EP1157692 (QUATEX NV [AN]); | [Y]WO2004056370 (PRONOVA BIOCARE AS [NO], et al); | [Y]WO2005123061 (TILLOTTS PHARMA AG [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2006067498 (SLA PHARMA AG [CH], et al); | [Y]US2007269507 (SACHETTO JEAN-PIERRE [CH], et al); | [A]WO2008002121 (HOVID BERHAD [MY], et al); | [Y]US2009011012 (BAUM SETH J [US]); | [Y]US2009030077 (ALMARSSON ORN [US], et al); | [Y]US2009054523 (BRYHN MORTEN [NO], et al) | Examination | - MARCHIOLI R ET AL, "Efficacy of n-3 polyunsaturated fatty acids after myocardial infarction: Results of GISSI-Prevenzione trial", LIPIDS 2001 AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS SOCIETY US, (2001), vol. 36, no. SUPPL., pages S119 - S126 | - MARCHIOLI ROBERTO ET AL, "Early protection against sudden death by n-3 polyunsaturated fatty acids after myocardial infarction: Time-course analysis of the results of the Gruppo Italiano per lo Studio della Sopravvivenza nell'Infarto Miocardico (GISSI)-Prevenzione", CIRCULATION, (20020423), vol. 105, no. 16, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 1897 - 1903 | - HARRIS W S ET AL, "Safety and efficacy of Omacor in severe hypertriglyceridemia.", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR RISK, (199710), vol. 4, no. 5-6, ISSN 1350-6277, pages 385 - 391 | - DAVIDSON MICHAEL H ET AL, "Efficacy and tolerability of adding prescription omega-3 fatty acids 4 g/d to simvastatin 40 mg/d in hypertriglyceridemic patients: an 8-week, randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled study.", CLINICAL THERAPEUTICS JUL 2007, (200707), vol. 29, no. 7, ISSN 0149-2918, pages 1354 - 1367 | by applicant | GB1393805 | EP0052510 | US4652441 | GB2209937 | ES2009346 | EP0346879 | US5445832 | US5502077 | US5656667 | US5698594 | WO9929316 | WO9929300 | US6245811 | US6284268 | US2004254357 |