EP2410255 - DEVICE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMATA, Toshiaki c/o Shiga Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1000-2 Aza Ootani Okamoto-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-8526 / JP | 02 /
KAWAI, Seiji c/o Shiga Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1000-2 Aza Ootani Okamoto-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-8526 / JP | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10750537.2 | 08.03.2010 | WO2010JP01592 | Priority number, date | JP20090059640 | 12.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009059640 | [2012/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010103779 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2410255 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/02, G05B23/02, G06Q50/00, H04Q9/00 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
G06Q10/063 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/52 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | GERÄTEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/04] | English: | DEVICE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2012/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE DISPOSITIF | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2011 | Translation filed | 05.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 19.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/16] | 13.07.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.01.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/16] | Appeal following examination | 11.09.2018 | Appeal received No. T2732/18 | 06.11.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.01.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 17.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001014026 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [I]JP2000121126 (TOSHIBA CORP) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [I]JPH05256482 (KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [I]JP2003074943 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [I] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2001014026 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2000121126 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH05256482 (TOSHIBA CORP.); | [Y]JP2003074943 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JP2001349598 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD); | [A]JP2007172406 (CUBIC CO LTD E); | [A]JP2004116820 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | by applicant | JP2008164228 |