EP2407450 - Method for producing optically active diamine derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE DIAMINE DERIVATIVE | ||
[2014/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANAMI, Koutarou c/o Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited 1-12-1, Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0014 / JP | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/03] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10750859.0 | 10.03.2010 | WO2010JP53976 | Priority number, date | JP20090061708 | 13.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009061708 | [2012/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010104106 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2407450 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2407450 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C269/06, C07C269/08, C07C271/24, C07D513/04, C07B53/00, C07B55/00, C07B61/00 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,US);
C07B53/00 (EP,US);
C07B55/00 (EP,US);
C07C247/14 (EP,US);
C07C269/06 (EP,US);
C07C269/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C269/06, C07C271/24 (EP,US);
C07C269/08, C07C271/24 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines optisch aktiven Diaminderivats | [2014/35] | English: | Method for producing optically active diamine derivative | [2014/35] | French: | Procédé de production d'un dérivé diamine optiquement actif | [2014/35] |
Former [2012/03] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OPTISCH AKTIVEN DIAMINDERIVATS | ||
Former [2012/03] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE DIAMINE DERIVATIVE | ||
Former [2012/03] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN DÉRIVÉ DIAMINE OPTIQUEMENT ACTIF | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2011 | Translation filed | 12.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 14.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.12.2014 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2010 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BE | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | HR | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | MK | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | SM | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | NO | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 22.04.2015 | |
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 22.04.2015 | |
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1925611 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 19 * examples 14-15; referential examples 1-3 * * [0023]; [0035]-[0036]; examples 14-15; referential examples 1-3 * [A] 1-18,20,21; | WO2007032498 [ ] (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al); | [A]US6353096 (LEON PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-3,11,12,18 * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 28; column 9-10, synthetic scheme; examples 1.2, 1.3, 2, 4 *; | [A] - M.TAKEISHI ET AL, DIE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, (1973), vol. 167, pages 261 - 272, XP002677575 [A] 1,4-7,9 * pages 271-272, Experimental, § 1, 3, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1973.021670118 | International search | [X]WO2007032498 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al); | [A]JPH04227629 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP); | [A]JP2000344735 (TOYO KASEI KOGYO CO LTD); | [A]JPH11180899 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) | by applicant | WO2007032498 | WO2004058715 | WO03016302 | WO03000680 |