EP2406413 - METHODS FOR MAKING THIN SEMICONDUCTOR BODIES FROM MOLTEN MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | METHODS AND APPARATI FOR MAKING THIN SEMICONDUCTOR BODIES FROM MOLTEN MATERIAL | ||
[2012/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 1366 Technologies Inc. 45 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACHS, Emanuel, M. 18 Moreland Avenue Newton MA 02459 / US | 02 /
WALLACE, Richard, L. 51 Nashoba Rd. Acton MA 01720 / US | 03 /
HANTSOO, Eerik, T. 20 Corporal McTernan St. Apt. 108 Cambridge MA 02139 / US | 04 /
LORENZ, Adam, M. 61 Palmer St. Arlington MA 02474 / US | 05 /
HUDELSON, G. D., Stephen 39 Grapevine Ave. Lexington MA 02421 / US | 06 /
JONCZYK, Ralf 130 Elsinore Street Concord MA 01742 / US | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2012/03] | Popp, Eugen Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10751275.8 | 09.03.2010 | [2018/22] | WO2010US26639 | Priority number, date | US20090237965P | 28.08.2009 Original published format: US 237965 P | US20090209582P | 09.03.2009 Original published format: US 209582 P | US20090224730P | 10.07.2009 Original published format: US 224730 P | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010104838 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406413 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2406413 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/44, C03B19/02, C30B19/06, C30B29/06, H01L21/02, H01L31/18, C30B15/30, C30B11/00, C30B28/04 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
C30B11/007 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02002 (KR);
B29C33/44 (KR,US);
C30B15/30 (EP,KR,US);
C30B19/068 (EP,KR,US);
C30B28/04 (EP,KR,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | C03B19/02, C30B19/06, C30B29/06, H01L21/02, H01L31/18, C30B15/30, C30B11/00, C30B28/04 | ||
Former IPC [2012/03] | C30B15/00, C03B19/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DÜNNER HALBLEITERKÖRPER AUS GESCHMOLZENEM MATERIAL | [2018/02] | English: | METHODS FOR MAKING THIN SEMICONDUCTOR BODIES FROM MOLTEN MATERIAL | [2018/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR FABRIQUER DES CORPS SEMI-CONDUCTEURS MINCES À PARTIR D'UN MATÉRIAU FONDU | [2018/02] |
Former [2012/03] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DÜNNER HALBLEITERKÖRPER AUS GESCHMOLZENEM MATERIAL | ||
Former [2012/03] | METHODS AND APPARATI FOR MAKING THIN SEMICONDUCTOR BODIES FROM MOLTEN MATERIAL | ||
Former [2012/03] | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR FABRIQUER DES CORPS SEMI-CONDUCTEURS MINCES À PARTIR D'UN MATÉRIAU FONDU | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 04.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2010 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | PT | 01.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.03.2010 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 30.05.2018 | |
LT | 30.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3903841 (PETERS THOMAS E) [A] 1,13* column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 15; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]EP1113096 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0059] , [0072] , [0088]; figures 6-9,14-15 * [A] 3,4,8,9; | [XA]WO2008090864 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,13-15 * abstract * [A] 3-12; | [P]EP2128088 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0020] - [0021] - [0036] , [0056] - [0063] - [0070] - [0071] - [0090] - [0091]; figures 1-5; claims 1-12 * | International search | [Y]US4670096 (SCHWIRTLICH INGO [DE], et al); | [Y]US5275226 (COOK ARNOLD J [US]); | [A]US2001044163 (TSUKUDA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US6596075 (IGARASHI KAZUTO [JP], et al); | [A]US7022180 (WALLACE JR RICHARD LEE [US]); | [A]US7186578 (GOMA SHUJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US7407550 (SACHS EMANUEL MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]WO2009002550 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [A]US2009004835 (DREVET BEATRICE [FR], et al); | [Y] - PRAKASH ET AL., "Use of silicon oxynitride as a graphite mold releasing coating for the growth of shaped multicrystalline silicon crystals", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 144, no. 1-2, (20020807), pages 41 - 47, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com, (20100523), XP024421777 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(94)90007-8 | [Y] - HIDE ET AL., "Mould shaping silicon crystal growth with a mould containing material by the spinning method", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 79, no. 1-3, (19861202), pages 583 - 589, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com, (20100523), XP024739688 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(86)90524-5 | Examination | JP2003226598 |