EP2477488 - AGROCHEMICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ALKYL POLYPROPYLENE GLYCOL POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2015/03] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STORK, Andreas Brückenschleeweg 22 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
RECKMANN, Udo Düsseldorfer Strasse 14/16 51063 Köln / DE | 03 /
PONTZEN, Rolf Am Kloster 69 42799 Leichlingen / DE | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2014/17] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/30] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10751575.1 | 02.09.2010 | WO2010EP05396 | Priority number, date | EP20090170160 | 14.09.2009 Original published format: EP 09170160 | US20090242119P | 14.09.2009 Original published format: US 242119 P | [2012/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011029552 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2477488 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2477488 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/30, A01P7/02, A01P7/04, A01N51/00, A01N43/40, A01N47/40 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
A01N25/30 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A01N43/40 (BR,KR);
A01N47/40 (BR);
A01N51/00 (BR,KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/30, A01N43/40, A01N47/40, A01N51/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALKYLPOLYPROPYLENGLYCOLPOLYETHYLENGLYCOL ENTHALTENDE AGROCHEMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2012/30] | English: | AGROCHEMICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING ALKYL POLYPROPYLENE GLYCOL POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL | [2012/30] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AGROCHIMIQUES CONTENANT DE L'ALKYLPOLYPROPYLÈNE GLYCOL POLYÉTHYLÈNE GLYCOL | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 09.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2010 | AL | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 02.09.2010 | |
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | MC | 17.06.2015 | |
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | IS | 17.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO9410839 (HOECHST AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE102006015467 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]); | [A]DE102006033572 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]); | by applicant | EP0356812 | WO0042847 | WO0130147 | WO03090531 | WO2008077921 |