EP2478675 - DISTRIBUTED FLOW MECHANISM FOR PEER-TO-PEER STREAMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASSOULIE, Laurent Technicolor 1 rue Jeanne d'Arc F-92443 Issy Les Moulineaux cedex / FR | 02 /
TOMOZEI, Dan-Cristian Technicolor 1 rue Jeanne d'Arc F-92443 Issy Les Moulineaux cedex / FR | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Lindemann, Robert Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 10751699.9 | 13.09.2010 | WO2010EP63402 | Priority number, date | EP20090305841 | 14.09.2009 Original published format: EP 09305841 | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011029936 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2478675 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/801, H04L12/715, H04L12/835, H04L12/825 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L45/64 (EP,US);
H04L47/12 (US);
H04L47/17 (EP,US);
H04L47/25 (EP,US);
H04L47/263 (EP,US);
H04L47/30 (EP,US);
H04L67/104 (EP,US);
H04L67/1085 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | VERTEILTER FLUSSMECHANISMUS FÜR PEER-TO-PEER-STREAMING | [2019/29] | English: | DISTRIBUTED FLOW MECHANISM FOR PEER-TO-PEER STREAMING | [2012/30] | French: | MÉCANISME DE FLUX DISTRIBUÉ POUR DIFFUSION DE POSTE À POSTE | [2019/29] |
Former [2012/30] | VERTEILTER FLUSSMECHANISMUS FÜR PEER-TO-PEER-STREAMING | ||
Former [2012/30] | MÉCANISME DE FLUX DISTRIBUÉ POUR DIFFUSION EN CONTINU DE POSTE À POSTE | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 11.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/21] | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0250655 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 2,5,6,10,11; | [XI]EP1441288 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 2,3,5,7,8 * the whole document * [I] 4,6; | [XP] - DAN-CRISTIAN TOMOZEI ET AL, "Flow Control for Cost-Efficient Peer-to-Peer Streaming", INTERNET CITATION, (20091221), page 12PP, URL: http://www.thlab.net/~dantom/pub/nc-rate.pdf, (20100505), XP007912941 [XP] 12-15 * page 2, column l - page 4, column l * | [A] - CHUAN WU ET AL, "Dynamic Bandwidth Auctions in Multioverlay P2P Streaming with Network Coding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20080601), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 1045-9219, pages 806 - 820, XP011205095 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 4 * | [A] - FABIO PICCONI AND LAURENT MASSOULIE, "ISP-friend or foe? Making P2P live streaming ISP-aware", INTERNET CITATION, (20081127), page COMPLETE, URL: http://www.thlab.net/~picconi/CR-PRL-2008-11-0001.pdf, (20090918), XP007909830 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 4 * | by applicant | - DESMOND S. LUN; NIRANJAN RATNAKAR; MURIEL MEDARD; RALF KOETTER; DAVID R. KARGER; TRACEY HO; EBAD AHMED; FANG ZHAO, "Minimum cost multicast over coded packet networks", IEEE/ACM TRANS. NETW., (2006), vol. 14, pages 2608 - 2623 | - S. BHADRA; S. SHAKKOTTAI; P. GUPTA, "Min-cost selfish multicast with network coding", INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE TRANSACTIONS, (2006), vol. 52, no. 11, pages 5077 - 5087 | - MINGHUA CHEN; MIROSLAV PONEC; SUDIPTA SENGUPTA; JIN LI; PHILIP A. CHOU, "Utility maximization in peer-to-peer systems", SIGMETRICS '08: PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2008 ACM SIGMETRICS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MEASUREMENT AND MODELING OF COMPUTER SYSTEMS, (2008), pages 169 - 180 |