EP2494339 - METHOD FOR DETECTING CRACKS IN SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/36] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING CRACKS IN SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATES | ||
[2019/29] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstraße 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORTNER, Andreas Mainzer Strasse 6L 55435 Gau-Algesheim / DE | 02 /
GERSTNER, Klaus Eleonorenstrasse 2 65474 Bischofsheim / DE | 03 /
VON CAMPE, Hilmar Jakob-Lengfelder-Strasse 19 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 04 /
STELZL, Michael Am Schinnergraben 65 55129 Mainz / DE | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Oliver Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/12] |
Former [2012/36] | Schmidt, Oliver Blumbach - Zinngrebe patentConsult Alexandrastraße 5 D-65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 10751799.7 | 13.08.2010 | [2017/29] | WO2010EP04980 | Priority number, date | DE20091050711 | 26.10.2009 Original published format: DE102009050711 | [2012/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011050873 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2494339 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494339 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2494339 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/95 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
G01N21/9505 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON RISSEN IN HALBLEITERSUBSTRATEN | [2019/29] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING CRACKS IN SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATES | [2019/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE FISSURES DANS DES SUBSTRATS SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2019/29] |
Former [2012/36] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION VON RISSEN IN HALBLEITERSUBSTRATEN | ||
Former [2012/36] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING CRACKS IN SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATES | ||
Former [2012/36] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE FISSURES DANS DES SUBSTRATS À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 29.09.2012 | Observations by third parties | 07.08.2015 | Observations by third parties | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2016 | Observations by third parties | 06.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2016 | 07.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.02.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2017 | 15.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.04.2018
26.04.2018
ADMISSIBLE Intego GmbH Henri-Dunant-Str. 8 91058 Erlangen / DE Opponent's representative FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2018/22] | 30.04.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.06.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.10.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.01.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.12.2019 | Appeal received No. T3279/19 | 17.09.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2010 | AL | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | MK | 19.07.2017 | MT | 19.07.2017 | NL | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | SM | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | AT | 13.08.2017 | IE | 13.08.2017 | LU | 13.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | FR | 19.09.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | GB | 19.10.2017 | NO | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 13.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 13.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 13.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 13.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 13.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
AT | 13.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 19.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | |
NO | 19.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]JPH08220008 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [AD] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2005231713 (OWEN MARK D [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,10,13-19 * paragraphs [0071] , [0072] , [0077]; figures 9-11 * [I] 2,6,11,12; | [A]CN1908638 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG [CN]) [A] 1,10* figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2009125896 (SEMISYSCO CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,8,10 * paragraphs [0111] - [0116] - [0190] - [0193]; figures 9-12 * | Examination | JP2001305072 | - RAKOTONIAINA J P ET AL., "Distribution and formation of silicon carbide and silicon nitride precipitates in block-cast multicrystalline silicon", 20TH EUROPEAN PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE, Barcelona, Spain, (20050606), pages 773 - 776 | - Lau W S, Infrared Characterization for Microelectronics, Singapore, World Scientific Publishing Co., (1999), page 145, ISBN 981-02-2352-8 | by applicant | JPH08220008 | DE10146879 | WO2008112597 | other | JP2001305072 | DE10316707 | - OGAWA T. AND N. NANGO, "Infrared light scattering tomography with an electrical streak camera for characterization of semiconductor crystals", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (19860601), vol. 57, no. 6, pages 1135 - 1139, XP001321609 | - NANGO N. ET AL, "Detection of very small defects and tiny inclusions just under mirror polished surfaces of silicon wafers by inside total reflection", J. APPL. PHYSICS, (1995), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 2892 - 2893, XP003028353 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.360033 | - FILLARD J.P., "Laser Scanning Tomography: A Non Destructive Qualification Test for Semiconductors", SOLID STATE DEVICE RESEARCH CONFERENCE, (19880913), pages C4-463 - C4-470, XP031652325 | - TAIJING L; TOYODA K; NANGO N; OGAWA T, "Observation of microdefects and microprecipitates in Si crystals by IR scattering tomography", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, (19910201), vol. 108, no. 3-4, pages 482 - 490, XP024430301 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(91)90225-T | - RUELAND E. ET AL., "OPTICAL [MU]-CRACK DETECTION IN COMBINATION WITH STABILITY TESTING FOR IN-LINE-INSPECTION OF WAFERS AND CELLS", 20TH EUROPEAN SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, (20050606), XP002561474 | - RAKOTONIAINA J.P. ET AL., "DISTRIBUTION AND FORMATION OF SILICON CARBIDE AND SILICON NITRIDE PRECIPITATES IN BLOCK-CAST MULTICRYSTALLINE SILICON", 20TH EUROPEAN PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE, (20050606), pages 773 - 776, XP055207291 | - INFRARED CHARACTERIZATION FOR MICROELECTRONICS, SINGAPORE, WORLD SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING CO. PTE LTD., (1999), page 145, ISBN 981-02-2352-8, XP003035290 | Opposition | US5355213 | JP2001305072 | US2005231713 | DE10316707 | CN1908638 | DE112006000392T | WO2009125896 | DE102009017786 | US8055058 | - OGAWA et al., "Infrared light scattering tomography with an electrical streak camera for characterization of semiconductor crystals", Rev. Sci. Instrum., (19860600), vol. 57, no. 6, pages 1135 - 1139, XP001321609 | - TAIJING et al., "Oberservation of microdefects and microprecipitates in Si crystals by IR scat- tering tomography", Journal of Crystal Growth, (19910000), vol. 108, no. 3-4, pages 482 - 490, XP024430301 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(91)90225-T | - NANGO et al., "Detection of very small defects and tiny inclusions just under mirror polished surfaces of silicon wafers by inside total reflection", J. Appl. Phys., (19950815), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 2892 - 2893, XP003028353 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.360033 | - E. RUELAND et al., "Optical µ-crack detection in combination with stability testing for in-line- inspection of wafers and cells", 20th European Solar Energy Conference and Exhibition, Barcelona, Spain, (20050606), pages 1 - 4, XP002561474 | - OGAWA et al., "Infrared light scattering tomography with an electrical streak camera for characterization of semiconductor crystals", Rev. Sci. Instrum., (19860600), vol. 57, no. 6, pages 1135 - 1139 | - TAIJING et al., "Oberservation of microdefects and microprecipitates in Si crystals by IR scat- tering tomography", Journal of Crystal Growth, (19910000), vol. 108, no. 3-4, pages 482 - 490 | - NANGO et al., "Detection of very small defects and tiny inclusions just under mirror polished surfaces of silicon wafers by inside total reflection", J. Appl. Phys., (19950815), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 2892 - 2893 | - Gräff O.; Ortner A.: "Neues Infrarot-Prüfverfahren zur Detektion von Mikrorissen in Silizium-Wafer". (DGaO-Proceedings 2010) |