EP2475559 - BRAKING SYSTEM FOR MOTOR VEHICLES AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNGBECKER, Johann Hauptstrasse 60 55576 Badenheim / DE | 02 /
LINKENBACH, Steffen Schöne Aussicht 60 65760 Eschborn / DE | 03 /
DRUMM, Stefan A. Burgunderstrasse 18 55291 Saulheim / DE | 04 /
SCHIEL, Lothar An der Tann 16 65719 Hofheim / DE | 05 /
BAYER, Ronald Schubertstrasse 6 63165 Mühlheim/Main / DE | 06 /
BESIER, Marco Kemeler Weg 9 65307 Bad Schwalbach / DE | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/29] | Application number, filing date | 10752563.6 | 07.09.2010 | WO2010EP63093 | Priority number, date | DE20091029369 | 11.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009029369 | DE20101040097 | 01.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010040097 | [2012/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011029812 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2475559 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/40 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
B60T8/4081 (EP,US);
B60T8/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | BREMSANLAGE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHREM BETRIEB | [2012/29] | English: | BRAKING SYSTEM FOR MOTOR VEHICLES AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME | [2012/29] | French: | INSTALLATION DE FREINAGE POUR VÉHICULES AUTOMOBILES ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SON FONCTIONNEMENT | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 05.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0265623 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-3,13 * column 4, line 4; figure 2 * [Y] 6,12; | [YA]FR2891790 (FREUDENBERG PSPE SOC PAR ACTIO [FR]) [Y] 6,12 * abstract * [A] 7; | [XAY]DE19543582 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,12,13 * column 7, line 5 - line 58; figure 1 * * column 9, line 26 - line 53 * [A] 7 [Y] 5,14,15; | [YA]WO9714593 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 5,14,15 * page 5, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 6, paragraph l - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 3; claims 1,5,6,10 * [A] 6,7; | [Y]DE102006014836 (LUCAS AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,8-10,13 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0055]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1795413 (MANDO CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-3,8-10,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 30 - line 34; figures 1,2 * * column 45 *; | [Y]DE19905660 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,8,10,11 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 33; figure 1; claim 13 *; | [Y]WO9812086 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,8,10,11 * page 8, line 37 - page 9, line 13; figure 4 *; | [A]DE19626926 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 6,7,12 * column 3, line 7 - line 28; figure . *; | [A]DE4213621 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 7,12 * figure - *; | [A]US3521934 (LEIBER HEINZ) [A] 14,15 * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 62; figures 3,4,4a *; | [A]DE4029793 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-3,10,13 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9422699 | by applicant | EP1950112 |