EP2409796 - METHOD FOR HOMOGENIZING MELTS BY MEANS OF CYCLICAL PHASE TRANSFORMATIONS AND A DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Alloys SA rue de Chantepoulet 1-3 1201 Genéve / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Advanced Alloys SA Rue de Chantepoulet 1-3 1201 Genéve / CH | ||
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states Ansimov, Oleg Vladimirovich Ul. Akademika Piljugina 14-2-417 Moscow 117393 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHTANKIN, Yury Valeryevich ul. Timura Frunze 34-10 Moscow 119034 / RU | 02 /
ANISMOV, Oleg Vladimirovich ul. Akademika Pilyugina ,14/2-417 Moscow, 117393 / RU | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | 01 /
SHTANKIN, Yury Valeryevich ul. Timura Frunze 34-10 Moscow 119034 / RU | ||
02 /
Anismov . Oleg Vladimirovich ul. Akademika Pilyugina ,14/2-417 Moscow, 117393 / RU | |||
Former [N/P] | 01 /
SHTANKIN, Yury Valeryevich ul. Timura Frunze 34-10 Moscow 119034 / RU | Representative(s) | Einsel, Martin Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1A D-38102 Braunschweig / DE | [2012/04] | Application number, filing date | 10753754.0 | 15.02.2010 | WO2010RU00062 | Priority number, date | RU20090110094 | 20.03.2009 Original published format: RU 2009110094 | [2012/04] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010107336 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | RU | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409796 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 23.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B22D27/00, C22F3/02, B22D27/04, C22B9/02 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
B22D27/00 (EP);
B22D27/045 (EP);
C22B9/026 (EP);
C22F3/02 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | B22D27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HOMOGENISIERUNG VON SCHMELZE MITTELS ZYKLISCHER PHASENWANDLUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [2012/04] | English: | METHOD FOR HOMOGENIZING MELTS BY MEANS OF CYCLICAL PHASE TRANSFORMATIONS AND A DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME | [2012/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR HOMOGÉNÉISER DES BAINS DE FUSION PAR DES TRANSFORMATIONS DE PHASE CYCLIQUES ET DISPOSITIF DE SA MISE EN OEUVRE | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2010 | Translation filed | 10.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 22.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]RU2164561 (INST MINERALOGII I PETROGRAFII); | [A]RU2035530 (KOZHEMYAKIN GENNADIJ NIKOLAEVI [UA]); | [A]SU971572 (DN METALL INST [SU]); | [A]US4770699 (MOUNTFORD NORMAN D G [CA]) | by applicant | RU2164561 |