|
26.02.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.08.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
92 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
86 |