Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9107933 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2015 | B2 | US2012129911 | 24.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US27541 | 16.03.2010 | US16067109 | 16.03.2009 | US201013257260 | 16.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2408796 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2020 | B1 | EP2408796 | 16.01.2013 | A4 | EP2408796 | 25.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US27541 | 16.03.2010 | US16067109 | 16.03.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010107838 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US16067109 | 16.03.2009 |