EP2471215 - SYSTEM, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR VERIFYING THE IDENTITY OF SOCIAL NETWORK USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trulioo Information Services Inc. 800-885 Georgia Street West Vancouver, BC V6C 3H1 / CA | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UFFORD, Stephen 318-1228 Marinaside Crescent Vancouver British Columbia V6Z 2W4 / CA | 02 /
JORGE, Tanis 5155 160th Street Surrey British Columbia V3S 0L2 / CA | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James, et al LOVEN Patents & Trademarks Limited 51 Wragby Road Sudbrooke Lincoln, Lincolnshire LN2 2QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Loven, Keith James, et al LOVEN Patents & Trademarks Limited 3 Checkpoint Court Lincoln LN6 3PW / GB | ||
Former [2012/27] | Loven, Keith James, et al LOVEN Patents & Trademarks Limited 3 Checkpoint Court Sadler Road Lincoln LN6 3PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10755514.6 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010IB00921 | Priority number, date | US20090164114P | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 164114 P | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010109332 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471215 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, G06F21/00, H04L12/16, G06Q10/10 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/27] | H04L9/32, G06F21/00, H04L12/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER IDENTITÄT VON BENUTZERN EINES SOZIALEN NETZWERKES | [2012/27] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR VERIFYING THE IDENTITY OF SOCIAL NETWORK USERS | [2012/27] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR VÉRIFIER L'IDENTITÉ D'UTILISATEURS DE RÉSEAUX SOCIAUX | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 18.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 05.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/06] | Public notification(s) | Noting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1)EPC | Trulioo Information Services Inc. 800-885 Georgia Street West Vancouver, BC V6C 3H1 / CA | [2012/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees FR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 30.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2012 | Decision despatched | 30.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 30.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 30.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2012 | Decision despatched | 30.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 30.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2008155019 (WALLACE ANDREW [US], et al); | [A]US2008162157 (DANILUK GRZEGORZ [PL]); | [A]US2008281710 (HOAL MARY KAY [US]); | [A]US2008288299 (SCHULTZ MICHAEL J [US]); | [AP]US2009119299 (RHODES HUE [US]); | [AP]US2009305667 (SCHULTZ MICHAEL J [US]); | [AP]US2009320101 (DOYLE III RICHARD PROCTOR [US], et al) |