EP2412420 - HONEYCOMB FILTER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HONEYCOMB FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZUTANI, Takashi c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
IWASAKI, Shingo c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
MIYAIRI, Yukio c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2018/20] |
Former [2012/05] | 01 /
MIZUTANI, Takashi c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
IWASAKI, Shingo c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | |||
03 /
MIYAIRI, Yukio c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2012/05] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10755812.4 | 26.02.2010 | [2018/20] | WO2010JP53150 | Priority number, date | JP20090076142 | 26.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009076142 | [2012/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010110011 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2412420 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2412420 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20, B01D53/94, B01J23/656, B01J35/04, F01N3/02 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J37/0215 (EP,US);
C04B28/24 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B35/63416 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
C04B38/0009 (EP,US);
C04B38/0019 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5059 (EP,US);
C04B41/87 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP,US);
C04B2235/428 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5228 (EP,US);
C04B2235/528 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5472 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6583 (EP,US);
C04B2237/083 (EP,US);
C04B2237/09 (EP,US);
C04B2237/365 (EP,US);
C04B2237/62 (EP,US);
C04B2237/704 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/24, C04B14/324, C04B14/4656, C04B16/0641, C04B38/0019 (US,EP);
C04B38/0009, C04B35/565, C04B38/0054, C04B38/0074 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/00, C04B38/0006 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/565, C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B41/5059, C04B41/0072, C04B41/4515, C04B41/4547, C04B41/457 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/72 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WABENFILTER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN WABENFILTER | [2012/05] | English: | HONEYCOMB FILTER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HONEYCOMB FILTER | [2012/05] | French: | FILTRE EN NID D'ABEILLES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2011 | Translation filed | 14.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 30.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 10.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2010 | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | IT | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | NL | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | NO | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | PT | 17.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0736503 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [XI]US2007028575 (OHNO KAZUSHIGE [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * figure 2a; example 1 * [I] 9-12; | [XI]US2007044444 (OSHIMI YUKIO [JP]) [X] 1-8 * figure 2a; example 1 * [I] 9-12; | [A]WO2008066167 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 9-12 * example 1 * | International search | [A]JPH09276708 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al); | [Y]JP2002519186 (SILENTOR NOTOX A/S); | [A]JP2004105792 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2004340023 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2006007117 (NE CHEMCAT CORP); | [A]WO2006041174 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2008066167 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]JP2010017648 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [AP]JP2010029848 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [AP]JP2010111567 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) | by applicant | JPS63240912 | JP2607898Y |