EP2412795 - CROSSLINKED MATERIAL COMPRISING ELASTIN AND COLLAGEN, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maruha Nichiro Corporation 2-20, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8608 / JP | For all designated states Sapporo Medical University 291, Minami 1-jo Nishi 17-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-0061 / JP | For all designated states Hirosaki University 1, Bunkyo-cho Hirosaki-shi, Aomori 036-8560 / JP | [2016/48] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Maruha Nichiro Corporation 2-20, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8605 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sapporo Medical University 291, Minami 1-jo Nishi 17-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-0061 / JP | |||
For all designated states Hirosaki University 1, Bunkyo-cho Hirosaki-shi, Aomori 036-8560 / JP | |||
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Maruha Nichiro Foods, Inc. 2-20, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8605 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sapporo Medical University 291, Minami 1-jo Nishi 17-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-0061 / JP | |||
For all designated states Hirosaki University 1, Bunkyo-cho Hirosaki-shi, Aomori 036-8560 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Yoshitaka c/o Sapporo Medical University Minami 1-jo Nishi 17-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-8556 / JP | 02 /
YOTSUYANAGI, Takatoshi c/o Sapporo Medical University Minami 1-jo Nishi 17-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-8556 / JP | 03 /
SUTO, Shinichi c/o Hirosaki University 1, Bunkyo-cho Hirosaki-shi Aomori 036-8560 / JP | 04 /
YAMAYA, Yoshifumi c/o Maruha Nichiro Holdings Inc. Central Research Institute 16-2 Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4295 / JP | 05 /
HOSHINO, Yosuke c/o Maruha Nichiro Holdings Inc. Central Research Institute 16-2 Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4295 / JP | 06 /
NISHIMURA, Kazunari c/o Maruha Nichiro Foods Inc. Foods & Fine Chemicals Department, 2-20 Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8608 / JP | 07 /
KOGA, Tomoko c/o Maruha Nichiro Holdings Inc. Central Research Institute 16-2 Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4295 / JP | 08 /
ENARI, Hiroyuki c/o Maruha Nichiro Holdings Inc. Central Research Institute 16-2 Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4295 / JP | [2016/52] |
Former [2012/05] | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Yoshitaka c/o Sapporo Medical University Minami 1-jo Nishi 17-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-8556 / JP | ||
02 /
YOTSUYANAGI, Takatoshi c/o Sapporo Medical University Minami 1-jo Nishi 17-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-8556 / JP | |||
03 /
SUTO, Shinichi c/o Hirosaki University 1 Bunkyo-cho Hirosaki-shi Aomori 036-8560 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAYA, Yoshifumi c/o Maruha Nichiro Holdings Inc. Central Research Institute 16-2 Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4295 / JP | |||
05 /
HOSHINO, Yosuke c/o Maruha Nichiro Holdings Inc. Central Research Institute 16-2 Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4295 / JP | |||
06 /
NISHIMURA, Kazunari c/o Maruha Nichiro Foods Inc. Foods & Fine Chemicals Department, 2-20 Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 1358605 / JP | |||
07 /
KOGA, Tomoko c/o Maruha Nichiro Holdings Inc. Central Research Institute 16-2 Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4295 / JP | |||
08 /
ENARI, Hiroyuki c/o Maruha Nichiro Holdings Inc. Central Research Institute 16-2 Wadai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4295 / JP | Representative(s) | Banfi, Paolo Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS Srl Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Banfi, Paolo Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2012/05] | Banfi, Paolo Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10755867.8 | 10.03.2010 | [2016/52] | WO2010JP54001 | Priority number, date | JP20090079898 | 27.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009079898 | JP20090260000 | 13.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009260000 | [2012/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010110067 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2412795 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2412795 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61L27/26, A61L27/38, A61L27/60, C12M1/12, C12N11/02 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
A61L27/26 (EP,US);
C07K14/46 (KR);
A61L27/22 (KR);
A61L27/24 (KR);
A61L27/3604 (EP,US);
A61L27/3817 (EP,US);
A61L27/3821 (EP,US);
A61L27/60 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/26, C08L89/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/15] | C12M1/00, A61L27/26, C12M3/00, C07K14/46, A61L27/36 | ||
Former IPC [2012/05] | C12M1/00, A61L27/00, C12M3/00, C07K14/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERNETZTES MATERIAL MIT ELASTIN UND COLLAGEN SOWIE VERWENDUNG | [2012/05] | English: | CROSSLINKED MATERIAL COMPRISING ELASTIN AND COLLAGEN, AND USE THEREOF | [2012/05] | French: | MATÉRIAU RÉTICULÉ À BASE D'ÉLASTINE ET DE COLLAGÈNE, ET SON UTILISATION | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2011 | Translation filed | 26.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 01.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2010 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | IE | 10.03.2017 | LU | 10.03.2017 | MT | 10.03.2017 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2017 | ||
LU | 10.03.2017 | ||
MT | 10.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2017 | ||
LU | 10.03.2017 | ||
MT | 10.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2017 | ||
LU | 10.03.2017 | ||
MT | 10.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2017 | ||
LU | 10.03.2017 | ||
MT | 10.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
IE | 10.03.2017 | ||
LU | 10.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
LU | 10.03.2017 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0602297 (ANGRA SRL [IT]) [A] 1-25 * claim - *; | [A]EP1283063 (GEISTLICH SOEHNE AG [CH]) [A] 1-25 * claim - *; | [I]US6660280 (ALLARD ROLAND [FR], et al) [I] 1-25 * claim - *; | [A]US2004265785 (DAMINK LEON OLDE [NL], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 2, paragraph 28 - page 3, paragraph 30 * * page 4, paragraphs 51-60 ** claim - *; | [A]EP1642599 (PENTAX CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 5, paragraphs 29-32 * * claim - *; | [A] - FRIESS W ED - LEHR CLAUS-MICHAEL DAUM NICOLE SCHNEIDER MARC SCHAFER ULRICH F, "Collagen - biomaterial for drug deliveryDedicated to Professor Dr. Eberhard Nu@?rnberg, Friedrich-Alexander-Universita@?t Erlangen-Nu@?rnberg, on the occasion of his 70th birthday", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980301), vol. 45, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0939-6411(98)00017-4, ISSN 0939-6411, pages 113 - 136, XP004256962 [A] 1-25 * page 117, paragraph 3.3 * * page 118, paragraph 3.4 - page 120, paragraph 3.4.8 * * page 125, paragraph 4.3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0939-6411(98)00017-4 | International search | [Y]WO02096978 (MIYAMOTO KEIICHI [JP]); | [Y]WO2007126411 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US], et al); | [Y] - AYAKO HONMURA ET AL., "Synergistic effect of collagen peptide and elastin peptide derived from salmon on promoting hyaluronic acid production and cell growth of normal human dermal fibroblast cells (SF-TY)", BULLETIN OF THE JAPANESE SOCIETY OF SCIENTIFIC FISHERIES, (20090115), vol. 75, no. 1, pages 86 - 88, XP008154599 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2331/suisan.75.86 | [Y] - MOTOHIKO TADA ET AL., "Sake Yurai Elestin Collagen Peptide no Hifu ni Taisuru Koka", JAPAN SOCIETY FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, AND AGROCHEMISTRY, (20080305), page 281, XP008162677 | [XP] - TAKATOSHI YOTSUYANAGI ET AL., "Sake Yurai Collagen /Elastin Takotai no Tokusei to Igakuteki Oyo", INOBESHON JAPAN 2009 KOSHIKI GAIDO BUKKU, (20090916), page 47, XP008154679 | by applicant | JPH0630616 | JP2997823B | JP3105308B | WO02096978 | JP2005095331 | JP3772232B |