EP2411130 - HIGH PERFORMANCE CROSS-LINKED POLYBENZOXAZOLE AND POLYBENZOTHIAZOLE POLYMER MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Chunqing UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | 02 /
TANG, Man-Wing UOP 2100 E. Orangethorpe Ave. Anaheim, California 92806 / US | 03 /
SERBAYEVA, Raisa UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | 04 /
ZHOU, Lubo UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/12] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/05] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10756536.8 | 22.02.2010 | WO2010US24855 | Priority number, date | US20090412633 | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 412633 | US20090412629 | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 412629 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010110975 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2411130 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/64, B01D67/00, C08J5/22, C08G73/22, C08G75/32, B01D71/66, B29C71/02, C08G73/10, C08L79/04 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
C08G75/32 (EP,KR);
B01D71/64 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/66 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0083 (EP,KR);
B01D67/009 (EP,KR);
C08G73/1042 (EP,KR);
C08G73/22 (EP,KR);
C08J5/22 (KR);
C08J7/08 (EP,KR);
C08L79/04 (EP);
B01D2323/30 (EP,KR);
B01D2323/345 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | B01D71/64, B01D67/00, C08J5/22, C08G73/22, C08G75/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | VERNETZTE HOCHLEISTUNGS-POLYBENZOXAZOL- UND POLYBENZOTHIAZOL-POLYMERMEMBRANEN | [2012/05] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE CROSS-LINKED POLYBENZOXAZOLE AND POLYBENZOTHIAZOLE POLYMER MEMBRANES | [2012/05] | French: | MEMBRANES POLYMÈRES DE POLYBENZOXAZOLE ET DE POLYBENZOTHIAZOLE RÉTICULÉS À HAUT RENDEMENT | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 18.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5409524 (JENSVOLD JOHN A [US], et al); | [Y]US2004050250 (PINNAU INGO [US], et al); | [Y]JP2004231875 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]KR100782959B | by applicant | US2004050250 | JP2004231875 | KR100782959B |